Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bongiorno et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jason Allan Arthur and Christopher Joseph Bongiorno
Case Number: 1:2020cv00469
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jason Allan Arthur on 4/18/2020, filed on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN)
April 15, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jason Allan Arthur, Receipt # 70072560000057679023 and Christopher Joseph Bongiorno, Receipt # 70072560000057679030, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (B,R)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 5/8/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/04/2020. (D,Ma)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jason Allan Arthur, Christopher Joseph Bongiorno. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jason A. Arthur, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
March 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
March 2, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (B,R)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Jason Allan Arthur, Christopher Joseph Bongiorno.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Whipple, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bongiorno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Allan Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Joseph Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: David Whipple
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?