Securities and Exchange Commission v. Copeland, et al.
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Brandon E. Copeland and E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00589
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Copy of #7 Application to enter Default, #12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order, #11 Notice of Magistrate Consent form, #10 and Default Entered was mailed to Brandon E. Copeland and E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc. at 1233 Oakwood Trail Painesville, OH 44077 on 4/27/2020. Related document(s) #7 , #12 , #11 , #10 . (L,Ja)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically. Conference all instructions to be emailed and mailed separately. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 Default Entered on 4/27/2020 against Defendants Brandon E. Copeland and E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Jason M. Lowbridge, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Ja)
April 27, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (B,R)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order: This case is returned to the Clerks Office for reassignment to Judge Pamela Barker as it was assigned in error to this Court. This case is a re-filing of Case No. 1:19 CV 2744, Securities and Exchange Commission v. Brandon Copeland, which was previously dismissed without prejudice. The case management conference scheduled before this Court is cancelled. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/24/20. (LC,S) re #8 , #6
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to postpone Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Related document(s) #6 . (Hughes, Leslie)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Brandon Copeland and E.B. Copeland Capital Inc. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leslie J. Hughes, #2 Proposed Order for Clerk's Entry of Default)(Hughes, Leslie)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 5/15/2020 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/07/20. (D,Ma)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Service of ECF No. 3 & 4 Proofs of Service filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related document(s) #3 , #4 .(Hughes, Leslie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc. on 3/20/2020, filed on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Hughes, Leslie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Brandon E. Copeland on 3/20/2020, filed on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Hughes, Leslie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Brandon E. Copeland, E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
March 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
March 19, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 1:19-cv-02744-PAB. Filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Brandon E. Cpeland, #3 Summons for E.B. & Copeland Capital Inc., #4 Exhibit 1 SEC Order) (Hughes, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Copeland, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.B. & Copeland Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Leslie J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?