Eaton Corporation v. Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC et al
Defendant: Wrena, LLC
Counter Claimant: Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC
Counter Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00893
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 62 Marginal Entry Order granting the parties' proposed stipulation to extend expert disclosure deadlines. (Doc. No. #61 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 8/25/2022. (V,AR)
August 20, 2022 Filing 61 Proposed Stipulation to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Related document(s) #40 , #52 .(King, Donnie)
July 28, 2022 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. Telephonic status conference held on July 28, 2022. Attorneys Eric D. Coleman and Sheena Y. Allen appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Joseph M. Campbell and Seth D. Gould appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court heard from counsel for both Plaintiff and Defendants on their clients' positions regarding the various issues presented in the motions to compel (Doc. Nos. #57 & #58 ) and opposition briefs (Doc. Nos. #59 & #60 .) After hearing the parties' positions, the Court ruled on both motions. (Court Reporter: Greg Mizanin.) Time: 55 minutes. (V,AR)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] DENYING in part with prejudice, DENYING in part without prejudice, and GRANTING in part Defendants' motion to compel for the reasons discussed at the July 28, 2022, status conference. (Doc. No. #57 .) For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIES with prejudice Plaintiff's motion as it relates to Plaintiff's alleged insufficient production of emails between Plaintiff and its customers regarding the warranty spill (related RFP#: 31, 47, 50, 54, 57, 64, 66, 67, 68, 69 & 77). The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion as it relates to any additional material it has regarding the Navistar PPAP submission (related RFP#: 12, 20, 22 & 23). The Court DENIES without prejudice Defendants' motion as it relates to communications between Plaintiff and its customers relevant to Defendants' counterclaims (related RFP#: 80-84). Defendants are ordered to review Plaintiff's July 20, 2022, production and notify the Court within twenty days if it has a good faith belief that Plaintiff's production is still insufficient. Parties are reminded to comply with L.R. 37.1. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/28/2022. (V,AR)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to compel for the reasons discussed at the July 28, 2022, status conference. (Doc. No. #58 .) Defendants are ordered to produce the requested financial documents by no later than August 3, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiff has leave of Court to depose Angstrom's CFO by September 9, 2022. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/28/2022. (V,AR)
July 26, 2022 Filing 60 Response to #58 Motion to compel the production of Defendants' Financial Documents filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, Jacob)
July 26, 2022 Filing 59 Opposition to #57 Motion to compel discovery filed by Eaton Corporation. (King, Donnie)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Defendants are to respond to Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (Doc. No. #58 ) by no later than COB on July 26, 2022. Parties should be prepared to discuss Plaintiff's motion to compel at the status conference scheduled for July 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/22/2022. (V,AR)
July 21, 2022 Filing 58 Motion to compel discovery (the production of Defendants' Financial Documents) filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation, Counter-Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C)(King, Donnie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] instructing Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion to compel discovery (Doc. No. #57 ) by no later than COB on July 26, 2022. Parties should be prepared to discuss Defendant's motion to compel at the status conference scheduled for July 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/21/2022. (V,AR)
July 20, 2022 Filing 57 Motion to compel discovery with memorandum in support filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Set of Interrogatories and Document Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Document Requests)(Campbell, Jacob) Modified on 7/21/2022 (L,Br).
June 30, 2022 Filing 56 Stipualted Inspection Protocol filed by Eaton Corporation. Related document(s) #39 .(King, Donnie)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by attorney Sheena Y. Allen for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Log in with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #55 ). Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 6/13/2022. (R,AP)
June 7, 2022 Filing 55 Motion for attorney Sheena Y. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11458427, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Sheena Y. Allen)(Castrodale, Joseph)
May 25, 2022 Filing 54 Motion for attorney Jacob M. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11437689, filed by Defendant Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Norcross, Scott)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by attorney Jacob M. Campbell for Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC and Wrena, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Log in with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #54 ). Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 5/25/2022. (R,AP)
May 23, 2022 Filing 53 Notice of Service of Proof of Service for Notice of Deposition of Michael Bassett filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC. (Gould, Seth)
April 4, 2022 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The telephonic status conference set for 4/19/2022 at 8:45 AM is cancelled. (R,AP)
March 10, 2022 Filing 52 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/10/22. Attorneys Donnie King and Eric Coleman participated on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorney Seth Gould participated on behalf of the defendants. Parties discussed the status of this case, including outstanding discovery issues and further mediation. At the joint request of the parties, the Court grants a 90-day extension of all fact discovery, expert discovery, and the filing of summary judgment motions. Fact Discovery is due by 7/26/22. Expert Reports for the party bearing the burden of proof are due on or before 9/9/22. Response Reports are due 10/10/22. Rebuttals are due by 11/10/22. Expert Discovery to be completed by 1/10/23. Dispositive Motions are due 2/10/23. A Telephonic Status Conference has been set for 7/28/22 at 10:00 AM. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on the line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Bridget Meehan Brennan at (216) 357-7200. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (R,AP)
February 24, 2022 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 01:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on the line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Bridget Meehan Brennan at (216) 357-7200. (R,AP)
February 22, 2022 Case reassigned to District Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan pursuant to General Order 2022-04. (O,K)
January 5, 2022 Filing 51 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/5/2022 with all counsel participating. Document discovery mostly exchanged and depositions to begin. Status Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 10 minutes. (M,S)
October 13, 2021 Filing 49 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/13/2021 with counsel for all parties participating. Parties have been working on discovery. Plaintiff estimates completing paper discovery rollout by the end of the month. Parties anticipate third party discovery as well. Defendant has filed a motion to compel which parties agree would be resolved by an extension of fact discovery to 04/26/2022 and the extension of all deadlines for 90 days. Accordingly all deadlines contained in the stipulated scheduling order #40 are extended 90 days. The motion to compel #46 is now moot and is termed. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (R,AP)
October 12, 2021 Filing 50 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric D. Coleman for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #47 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/12/2021. (R,AP)
October 12, 2021 Filing 48 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel ofAshleigh J. Morpeau and Lally A. Gartel, filed by Eaton Corporation. (Castrodale, Joseph)
October 12, 2021 Filing 47 Motion for attorney Eric D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11078302, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Castrodale, Joseph) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (O,K).
October 6, 2021 Filing 46 Motion to compel plaintiff to produce documents, with memorandum in support, filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' First Set of Discovery, #2 Exhibit B -Plaintiff's Discovery Responses). (Norcross, Scott)
May 12, 2021 Filing 45 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/12/21 with all counsel participating. Parties are following the stipulated scheduling order. Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. All counsel notified of this order. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 10 Minutes. (T,A)
May 6, 2021 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Gould, Seth)
May 6, 2021 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Gould, Seth)
April 20, 2021 Filing 42 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants Counterclaims filed by Eaton Corporation. Related document(s) #41 . (Marsh, Michael)
March 19, 2021 Filing 41 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Eaton Corporation, filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Norcross, Scott)
February 16, 2021 Filing 40 Stipulated Scheduling Order. Defendants shall file an answer to the Complaint and any counterclaim(s) by 3/19/2021. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' responsive pleading by 4/20/2021. The Parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 5/4/2021. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 8/31/2021. Non-Expert Discovery due by 1/26/2022. Expert report(s) for any party with the burden of proof on an issue shall be served by 3/9/2022. Expert report(s) for any party without the burden of proof on an issue shall be served by 4/7/2022. Rebuttal expert reports shall be served by 5/3/2022. Expert discovery shall be completed by 7/7/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2022. SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/16/2021. re #37 . (M,S)
February 16, 2021 Filing 39 Stipulated Order Regarding Clutch Sampling Protocol. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/16/2021. re #38 . (M,S)
February 16, 2021 Filing 38 Stipulated Order Regarding Clutch Sampling Protocol, filed by Eaton Corporation. (King, Donnie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 37 Proposed Stipulated Scheduling Order, filed by Eaton Corporation. Related document(s) #18 . (King, Donnie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 36 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/16/2021 with all counsel participating. Parties have come to an agreement on protocol and scheduling order. Parties to submit proposed orders. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
January 11, 2021 Filing 35 Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/8/2021. (M,S)
January 8, 2021 Filing 34 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound)(Marsh, Michael)
December 28, 2020 Filing 33 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/28/2020 with all counsel participating. Parties have continued to engage the private mediator in an attempt to reach a resolution. Plaintiff to submit additional information after Protective Order is signed by all parties. Counsel agree to work together. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
November 10, 2020 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Seth D. Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10409977, filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Norcross, Scott - s/Paige M. Rabatin) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (M,TL).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Seth D. Gould for Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #32 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/10/2020. (M,S)
October 20, 2020 Filing 31 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/20/2020 with all counsel participating. Mediation was held on 10/15/2020 which was not successful (Private Mediation). Mediator is still involved in an attempted resolution. Plaintiff is storing items in question in Indiana that Plaintiff wants to re-purpose the clutches to sell in the after market to mitigate damages. Parties to work together to inspect merchandise for sale. Status Conference set for 12/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. All counsel notified of this ORDER. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Time: 20 minutes. (Y,A)
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Donnie M. King for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #28 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 20-893.(M,S)
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael C. Marsh for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #27 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/19/2020.(M,S)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 Motion for attorney Donnie M. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10345695, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Donnie M. King)(Castrodale, Joseph)
October 15, 2020 Filing 27 Motion for attorney Michael C. Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10345605, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Michael C. Marsh)(Castrodale, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 26 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Marc L. Newman for Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC and Wrena, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #24 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/18/2020. (M,S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric J. Minch for Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC and Wrena, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #23 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/18/2020. (M,S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for attorney Marc L. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10191296, filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc Newman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Norcross, Scott - s/Paige M. Rabatin) Modified to note attorney signature on 8/18/2020 (M,TL).
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Eric J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10191316, filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Minch, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Norcross, Scott - s/Paige M. Rabatin) Modified attorney name on 8/18/2020 (M,TL).
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance and substitution of Counsel by Scott A. Norcross filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Norcross, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order. While Eaton asserts that the ADR provision in its contracts is permissive, not mandatory, it has agreed to participate in an early mediation. As such, the Court finds it unnecessary to rule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The parties are ordered to proceed to mediation. This action is STAYED for 90 days to permit the parties to complete the mediation process. If the dispute between the parties is not resolved through mediation, Status Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF #17 ) is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/13/2020. (M,S)
July 10, 2020 Filing 20 Reply in support of #17 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Mediation: Law, Policy and Practice, #2 Exhibit B: June 23, 2020 Email)(Kaufman, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition to #17 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Eaton Corporation. (Castrodale, Joseph)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2020. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 1/1/2021. Set Deadlines as to #17 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Response due by 7/6/2020. Reply due by 7/10/2020. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. Related document(s) #17 . (M,S)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to dismiss without prejudice for failure to state a claim filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Declaration)(Pollack, Lawrence)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Rule 26(f) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Eaton Corporation. (Secco, Nicholas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/26/2020 at 09:45 AM at to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/3/2020. (M,S)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC answer due 6/24/2020; Wrena, LLC answer due 6/24/2020. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/26/2020. (M,S)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Steven S. Kaufman filed by on behalf of Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Kaufman, Steven)
May 25, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 24, 2020 to answer #1 filed by Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Pollack, Lawrence)
May 25, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Lawrence D. Pollack filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Pollack, Lawrence)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC on 5/4/2020; Wrena, LLC on 5/4/2020, both signed "CB 7548 Covid 19" filed on behalf of Eaton Corporation Related document(s) #3 . (S,AN)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ashleigh J. Morpeau for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/2020. (M,S)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lally A. Gartel for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/2020. (M,S)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Nicholas J. Secco for Eaton Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/2020. (M,S)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Ashleigh J. Morpeau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9948669, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ashleigh J. Morpeau)(Castrodale, Joseph)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Lally A. Gartel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9948636, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lally A. Gartel)(Castrodale, Joseph)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Nicholas J. Secco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9948579, filed by Plaintiff Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas J. Secco)(Castrodale, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC Receipt # 9414 7266 9904 2972 3153 16 and Wrena, LLC Receipt # 9414 7266 9904 2972 3153 23 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (J,G)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC, Wrena, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation PLC for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Castrodale, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9940505. Filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Purchase Agreement, #2Exhibit B - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit - Terms and Conditions, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Angstrom summons, #6 Wrena summons) (Castrodale, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
April 24, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton Corporation v. Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Angstrom Automotive Group, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence D. Pollack
Represented By: Steven S. Kaufman
Represented By: Nicholas B. Wille
Represented By: Scott A. Norcross
Represented By: Paige M. Rabatin
Represented By: Eric J. Minch
Represented By: Marc L. Newman
Represented By: Seth D. Gould
Represented By: Jacob M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Joseph A. Castrodale
Represented By: Gregory J. Phillips
Represented By: Ashleigh J. Morpeau
Represented By: Nicholas J. Secco
Represented By: Lally A. Gartel
Represented By: Donnie M. King
Represented By: Michael C. Marsh
Represented By: Eric D. Coleman
Represented By: Lally A Gartel
Represented By: Sheena Y. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wrena, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence D. Pollack
Represented By: Steven S. Kaufman
Represented By: Nicholas B. Wille
Represented By: Scott A. Norcross
Represented By: Paige M. Rabatin
Represented By: Eric J. Minch
Represented By: Marc L. Newman
Represented By: Seth D. Gould
Represented By: Jacob M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?