Agiliti Health, Inc. v. Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Agiliti Health, Inc.
Defendant: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01050
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. (Heasley, R.)
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-00373. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (W,CM)
May 14, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,CM)
May 14, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (W,CM)
May 14, 2020 Copy of #17 Magistrate Consent Form and Docket Sheet mailed to Scott Blakeley at BLAKELEY LLP 18500 Von Karman Ave., Suite 530, Irvine, CA 92612 on 5/14/2020. (W,CM)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division is GRANTED. ECF No. #12 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division. (Case to be transferred after 5/12/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/28/2020. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER Re: #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time of: Defendants Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time Within Which to File Initial Responsive Pleading by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/28/2020. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time of: Defendants Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time Within Which to File Initial Responsive Pleading by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. (Turner, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division)(Turner, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Initial Responsive Pleading filed by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.GRANTED - ORDERED. #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott Emery Blakeley. filed by Agiliti Health, Inc. ; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/24/20. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Initial Responsive Pleading by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. (Turner, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter Turner filed by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. ORDERED GRANTED. #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice R. Scott Heasley filed by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/23/20. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice R. Scott Heasley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7826594), by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A)(Heasley, R.) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter Turner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7826273) by Defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A)(Turner, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Agiliti Health, Inc.. Agiliti Health, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott Emery Blakeley. The Certificate of Good Standing was not attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7801725) Certificate of Good Standing for Scott E. Blakeley by Plaintiff Agiliti Health, Inc.. (Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Scott E. Blakeley. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott Emery Blakeley. The Certificate of Good Standing was not attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7801725) by Plaintiff Agiliti Health, Inc.. (Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Process Server: by Plaintiff Agiliti Health, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Agiliti Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P.,. (Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7801568, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Agiliti Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Termination Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Summons Summons)(Blakeley, Scott) [Transferred from moed on 5/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agiliti Health, Inc. v. Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agiliti Health, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Blakeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: R. Scott Heasley
Represented By: Peter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?