Rossa, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Plaintiff: Torre Rossa, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv01095
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Reply in support of #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Torre Rossa, LLC. (Connick, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand until 8/26/2020. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/14/2020.(R,Sh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 8/26/2020 to file reply brief in support of #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Torre Rossa, LLC. Related document(s) #7 . (Connick, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Farrell, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #8 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 8/5/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to remand to State Court . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 7/15/2020.(R,Sh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 8/5/2020 to respond to #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance. Related document(s) #7 . (Farrell, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Torre Rossa, LLC. (Connick, Thomas)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Stipulated #6 Motion for extension to file motion to remand until 7/1/2020, then 21 days after this Courts ruling on plaintiff's motion to remand answer shall be filed. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 6/10/2020.(S,SR)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for extension of time to file motion to remand and to respond to complaint until 7/1/2020, filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kavouras, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Torre Rossa, LLC. (Connick, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
May 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
May 20, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Kavouras, Daniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Kavouras, Daniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-931885 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9987357. Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete State Court Docket and Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Sheridan Declaration) (Kavouras, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossa, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torre Rossa, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?