Szabo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jean Szabo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01206
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Fed Ex executed upon Department of Justice, Office of US Attorney on 6/11/2020, Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Fed Ex executed upon Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region V, Social Security Administration on 6/11/2020 signed C19, Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Fed Ex executed upon William Barr US Attorney General on 6/11/2020 filed on behalf of Jean Szabo Related document(s) #6 . (K,AR)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/3/2020. (S,JM)
June 2, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/2/2020. (L,MI)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
June 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (L,MI)
June 2, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (L,MI)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Jean Szabo. Related document(s) #1 .(Shifrin, Debra)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jean Szabo. Related document(s) #1 . (Shifrin, Debra)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jean Szabo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285) (Shifrin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szabo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Szabo
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?