Gonzales v. Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Gonzales
Defendant: Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law and Scott Martin Deliman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01290
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Scott Martin Deliman, Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law. Related document(s) #6 .(Dorman, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Martin Deliman, Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law. (Dorman, Andrew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Joseph Gonzales. (Rosca, Alan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Mark S. Goldman for Joseph Gonzales. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/22/2020.(R,Sh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Mark S. Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Admission List and Certificate of Pro Hac Vice Registration. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10118657, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gonzales. (Rosca, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joseph Gonzales. Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020 filed on behalf of Joseph Gonzales (Rosca, Alan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joseph Gonzales. Scott Martin Deliman waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020 filed on behalf of Joseph Gonzales (Rosca, Alan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Scott Martin Deliman, Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
June 12, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Tinl and Deliman and Scott Martin Deliman. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10036494. Filed by Joseph Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Def. Tinl & Deliman Attorneys-at-law, #3 Summons for Scott Martin Deliman) (Rosca, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gonzales
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinl & Deliman, Attorneys-at-law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Martin Deliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?