Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Amica Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Premium Plus Inc., Amica Inc. and 1 Group LLC doing business as StoveGuard
Case Number: 1:2020cv01521
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendants' #7 Motion for extension of time until September 27, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond Amica Inc. answer due 9/27/2020; Premium Plus Inc. answer due 9/27/2020.. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/25/2020.(R,Sh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Premium Plus Inc.. (Gaum, R.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hartford Financial Services, Inc. for Amica Inc. filed by Amica Inc.. (Gaum, R.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until September 27, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond filed by Amica Inc., Premium Plus Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaum, R.)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Amica Inc. on 8/7/2020 - Received by signature "C19 Del", filed on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
August 3, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Amica Inc. Receipt # 7019 1120 0001 6951 5220, Premium Plus Inc. Receipt # 7019 1120 0001 6951 5190 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (J,G)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Amica Inc. and Premium Plus Inc.. (H,SP)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons to Defendant's Amica Inc. and Premium Plus Inc. filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Uhl, Judd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 9, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
July 9, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, identifying Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Uhl, Judd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against Amica Inc., 1 Group LLC, Premium Plus Inc. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10096078. Filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hartford Casualty Insurance Company Insurance Policy) (Uhl, Judd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Amica Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Plus Inc.
Represented By: R. Eric Gaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Inc.
Represented By: R. Eric Gaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Group LLC doing business as StoveGuard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?