Peacock v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brad Peacock
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01580
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 7/22/2020 filed on behalf of Brad Peacock Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Tracking information from USPS)(Margolius, Marcia)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Regional Chief Counsel SSA on July 24, 2020 filed on behalf of Brad Peacock Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Domestic Return Receipt - Regional Chief Counsel SSA)(Margolius, Marcia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Attorney General on July 31, 2020 filed on behalf of Brad Peacock Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Domestic Return Receipt - Attorney General)(Margolius, Marcia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (S,HR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Local Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR)
July 17, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/17/2020. (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10113089. Filed by Brad Peacock. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel - SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peacock v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Peacock
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?