DDR DB Stone Oak, L.P. v. White House Black Market, Inc.
Plaintiff: DDR DB Stone Oak, L.P.
Defendant: White House Black Market, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01621
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Dismissal without prejudice. Plaintiff and Defendant shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Related document #6 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/18/2020. (K,K)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by DDR DB Stone Oak, L.P.. (Koberna, Mark)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copy of State Court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (L,MI)
July 28, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] On July 28, 2020, the Court held a scheduled teleconference attended by Plaintiffs' counsel Mark R. Koberna and Sean T. Koran and Defendant's counsel George H. Carr. The Court discussed the status of the case and strongly encouraged the parties to begin settlement discussions. To facilitate these discussions, the Court extended the deadline for responsive pleadings to September 15, 2020. The Court scheduled a follow-up teleconference for September 2, 2020 at 9:00AM. Clients and counsel are required to attend and may use the same dial-in instructions.(Court Reporter: n/a.)Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by White House Black Market, Inc.. (Carr, George)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by White House Black Market, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Carr, George)
July 23, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
July 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20 CV 933646 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10123299. Filed by White House Black Market, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Complaint) (Carr, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDR DB Stone Oak, L.P. v. White House Black Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White House Black Market, Inc.
Represented By: George H. Carr
Represented By: Michael J. Sikora, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDR DB Stone Oak, L.P.
Represented By: Sean T. Koran
Represented By: Mark R. Koberna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?