Lovett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gregory Lovett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01698
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s) #10 . (Y,A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for further proceedings. Related Document #9 . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/31/2020. (R,Sh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Johnson, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 8/12/2020; U.S. Attorney General and the Office of Regional Chief Counsel (signed c-19) on 8/13/20 by FedEx, filed on behalf of Gregory Lovett. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,Ky)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/10/20. (D,Ky)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/10/20.(D,Ky)
July 31, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 7/31/2020. (L,MI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
July 31, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
July 31, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Gregory Lovett. (Braun, Katherine)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Gregory Lovett. (Braun, Katherine)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Gregory Lovett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Appeals Council Denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lovett
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?