Woodward v. VanCuren Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blaire Woodward
Defendant: David Van Curen and VanCuren Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01818
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 03:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr., with counsel only. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/8/2020. (R,Sh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by James O'Connor, Jr filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (O'Connor, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (O'Connor, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by David Van Curen, VanCuren Services, Inc.. (O'Connor, James)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Stipulation & Order on Tolling of Statute of Limitations. re #11 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/8/2020. (R,Sh)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #10 Unopposed Motion for leave to plead until 9/29/2020. David Van Curen answer due 9/29/2020; VanCuren Services, Inc. answer due 9/29/2020. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/8/2020.(R,Sh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulation on Tolling of Statute of Limitations filed by Blaire Woodward. (Anderson, Kyle)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for leave to plead until 9/29/2020 filed by David Van Curen, VanCuren Services, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (O'Connor, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by personal service executed upon VanCuren Services, Inc. on 8/19/2020, filed on behalf of Blaire Woodward (Anderson, Kyle) Related document #6
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon David Van Curen on 8/19/2020, filed on behalf of Blaire Woodward (Anderson, Kyle) Related document #7
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon David Van Curen. (J,G)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon VanCuren Services, Inc. (J,G)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons (D. Van Curen) filed by Blaire Woodward. (Anderson, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Blaire Woodward. (Anderson, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
August 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
August 17, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet (corrected), filed by Blaire Woodward. Related document(s) #1 . (Anderson, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against David Van Curen, VanCuren Services, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10188286.. Filed by Blaire Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - FLSA Consent to Join) (Anderson, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodward v. VanCuren Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Van Curen
Represented By: Jonathan H. Krol
Represented By: James O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanCuren Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Krol
Represented By: James O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaire Woodward
Represented By: Kyle T. Anderson
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?