Symbology Innovations, LLC v. Swagelok Company
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Swagelok Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01824
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff Symbology Innovations, LLC, Counter-Defendant Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Swagelok Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Pejic, Nenad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Symbology Innovations, LLC filed by Swagelok Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (LInkedIn), #2 Exhibit B (Website), #3 Exhibit C (Website), #4 Exhibit D (1999 SEC Report), #5 Exhibit E (Barpoint claim chart), #6 Exhibit F ('051 application), #7 Exhibit G ('554 patent), #8 Exhibit H ('053 patent), #9 Exhibit I ('978 publication), #10 Exhibit J ('978 claim chart), #11 Exhibit K ('554 claim chart), #12 Exhibit L ('752 patent), #13 Exhibit M (Prior art claim chart), #14 Exhibit N (Prior art claim chart), #15 Exhibit O (2004 SEC Report), #16 Exhibit P (Settlement Agreement), #17 Exhibit Q ('773 patent), #18 Exhibit R ('773 Pros. history), #19 Exhibit S ('773 Pros. history), #20 Exhibit T ('773 Pros. history)(Pejic, Nenad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Alexander filed by on behalf of Swagelok Company. (Alexander, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Nenad Pejic filed by on behalf of Swagelok Company. (Pejic, Nenad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A- Witness List, #2 Appendix B- Exhibit List) (B,R)
September 16, 2020 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (B,R)
September 16, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. (B,R)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Sara Lioi for all further proceedings. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/16/2020. (L,Ja)
September 10, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Swagelok Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 1216. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Swagelok Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 18, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (B,R)
August 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
August 18, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Infringement of Patent with jury demand against Swagelok Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10190281. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:20-cv-01795-JRA. Filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8424752, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Curfman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations, LLC v. Swagelok Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swagelok Company
Represented By: Andrew W. Alexander
Represented By: Nenad Pejic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?