Kurman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Danielle Kurman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01837
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the US Assistant for the Northern District on 8/25/2020; by FedEx upon the Social Security Administration on 8/29/2020 (marked C-19); and by FedEx upon the US Attorney General on 8/27/2020 filed on behalf of Danielle Kurman Related document(s) #4 . (J,FE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/21/2020. (G,CA)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration (c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/21/2020. (G,CA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James S. Gwin on 8/19/2020. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Danielle Kurman. (Wilson, Rachel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Danielle Kurman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst. US Atty for ND of Ohio, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst US Atty for ND of OH) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kurman
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?