Smith et al v. Swaffer
Plaintiff: Christopher D. Smith, Areti Ventures, LLC, Westlake Investment Group, LLC., James Sustar, Jeffrey Thomas, Matthew Garland, Caream Kamide, Sharon Conrad, BWO, LLC and Bud Brothers, LLC
Defendant: Kris Swaffer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01848
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 23, 2020 to answer Complaint. Kris Swaffer answer due 10/23/2020. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/23/2020.(K,K)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 23, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Kris Swaffer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Fifner, Curtis)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Kris Swaffer on 9/2/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #6 . (L,Br)
August 21, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Kris Swaffer placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70162140000102822631. (W,Jo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kris Swaffer. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
August 19, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bud Brothers, LLC. (Teare, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BWO, LLC. (Teare, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Areti Ventures, LLC. (Teare, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Westlake Investment Group, LLC.. (Teare, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Kris Swaffer. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10197890. Filed by Jeffrey Thomas, Matthew Garland, Westlake Investment Group, LLC., BWO, LLC, Sharon Conrad, Areti Ventures, LLC, Caream Kamide, Christopher D. Smith, Bud Brothers, LLC, James Sustar. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant Kris Swaffer, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haren, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Swaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D. Smith
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Areti Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Investment Group, LLC.
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sustar
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thomas
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Garland
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caream Kamide
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Conrad
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWO, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Haren
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Karl E. May
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Swaffer
Represented By: Curtis M. Fifner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?