Al-Zou'bi et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, L. M. A., Mazin Mohammad Fateh Al-Zou'bi, Nereeman Mohammad Fadol Azaizeh, Faleh Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi and Deba'e Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi
Defendant: Loren Miller, Chad Wolf, USCIS, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, DHS, Terri Robinson, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv01862
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Renee A. Bacchus filed by on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Loren Miller, Terri Robinson, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Bacchus, Renee)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED Document: Reference List of personal identifiers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Bratton, Scott)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Reference List of Personal Identifiers Under Seal (Related Doc #6 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/26/2020.(R,Sh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to seal reference list of personal identifiers filed by L. M. A., Deba'e Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, Faleh Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, Mazin Mohammad Fateh Al-Zou'bi, Mohammad Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, Nereeman Mohammad Fadol Azaizeh. (Bratton, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Terri Robinson. (W,CM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons- Robinson)(Bratton, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kenneth Cuccinelli, Loren Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
August 21, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
August 21, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bratton, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Kenneth Cuccinelli, DHS, Loren Miller, Terri Robinson, USCIS, Chad Wolf. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10201812. Filed by Deba'e Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, Mazin Mohammad Fateh Al-Zou'bi, Faleh Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi, L. M. A., Nereeman Mohammad Fadol Azaizeh, Mohammad Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- H-1B/H-4 approvals, #4 Exhibit B - I-140 approval, #5 Exhibit C- I-485 receipts, #6 Exhibit D- EAD approvals, #7 Exhibit E- Transfer Notices, #8 Exhibit F- EAD denials, #9 Exhibit G -USCIS case status, #10 Exhibit H - Senator's office response, #11 Exhibit I - Notice of decision of Mazin, #12 Exhibit J- Notices of decisions of other Plaintiffs, #13 Exhibit K - Motion to reopen/reconsider, #14 Exhibit L - motion to reopen denials, #15 Exhibit M - visa bulletin October 1, 2017) (Bratton, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Zou'bi et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Miller
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Robinson
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. M. A.
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazin Mohammad Fateh Al-Zou'bi
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nereeman Mohammad Fadol Azaizeh
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faleh Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deba'e Mazin Mohammad Al-Zou'bi
Represented By: Scott E. Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?