Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Eaton Corporation
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01906
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (Attachments: #1 Order)(W,Na)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order of Dismissal with prejudice. (Related document #12 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/21/2021. (K,K)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #10 Joint Motion for extension of all deadlines until 02/17/2021. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/19/2021.(K,K)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Motion for extension of all deadlines until 02/17/2021 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension)(White, Brandon)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order On this day came on to be considered the #8 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. The Court having now reviewed said Motion finds that it is well taken and should be granted. It is, therefore,ordered that the Motion is hereby granted and all deadlines are further stayed until January 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/4/2020.(K,K)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to stay All Deadlines until January 18, 2021 and Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] approving Defendant's #7 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time until 12/7/2020 to Answer Complaint. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/2/2020. (K,K)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time until 12/7/2020 to Answer Complaint filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Eaton Corporation on 10/17/2020, filed on behalf of Stormborn Technologies LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 First Amended complaint for infringement of patent against Eaton Corporation. Filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE44199E, #2 Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart) (Wernow, Howard)
October 13, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Eaton Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70200090000144291285. (W,Jo)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Infringement of Patent with jury demand against Eaton Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10217239. Filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE44199E, #2 Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Wernow, Howard)
August 26, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (Y,A)
August 26, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
August 26, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?