Littlejohn v. May
Petitioner: Robert A. Littlejohn
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 1:2020cv02007
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Writ (2254) #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), filed by Harold May. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-24 State Court Record, #2 Supplement Tr. Vol. 1)(Jaite, Maura)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Jaite, Maura)
September 15, 2020 Copy of #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Warden Harold May, Toledo Correctional Institution, 2001 East Central Avenue, Toledo, OH 43608; and emailed to the Office of the Ohio Attorney General on 9/15/2020. (G,CA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent to file an answer ("Return of Writ") to the petition within 60 days from the date of this order; Petitioner to file a reply by way of a Traverse within 30 days from the filing of Respondent's answer; Respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/15/2020. (G,CA)
September 9, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/9/2020. (S,AL)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Robert A. Littlejohn. Related document(s) #1 . (Patterson, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
September 8, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
September 8, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid $5, receipt number AOHNDC-10247016. Filed by Robert A. Littlejohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment of Sentence, #2 Exhibit Judgment of Conviction, #3 Exhibit Appellee Brief, #4 Exhibit Appellant Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit Appellant Brief) (Patterson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littlejohn v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert A. Littlejohn
Represented By: David N. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?