McHugh v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian McHugh
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02236
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/23/2020. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 5/30/2021. Status Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 20 minutes. (M,S)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Hofstetter, John)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Hofstetter, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of State Court Documents Received from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, Case Number CV-20-936630. (S,AN)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting Parties Stipulation and Joint Motion for Leave to Plead until November 6, 2020 (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/7/2020. (M,S)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation and Joint Motion for leave to Plead filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Hofstetter, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/23/2020 at 10:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/5/2020. (M,S) Modified text on 10/5/2020 (M,S).
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
October 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
October 2, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Compass Group PLC for Compass Group USA, Inc. filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Hofstetter, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-936630 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10314852.. Filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hofstetter, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: John W. Hofstetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McHugh
Represented By: Stephan I. Voudris
Represented By: Bradley Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?