Tiny's Construction, LLC v. Ecoverse Industries, Ltd
Plaintiff: Tiny's Construction, LLC
Defendant: Ecoverse Industries, LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv02349
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Thomas L. Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Tiny's Construction, LLC. (Rosenberg, Thomas)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Moeller, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey S. Moeller filed by on behalf of Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Moeller, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Keith A. Savidge filed by on behalf of Ecoverse Industries, LTD. (Savidge, Keith)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
October 15, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,L)
October 15, 2020 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,L)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:20-cv-00737. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division; and that Ecoverse be granted fourteen (14) days to file its answer following transfer. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Transfer to Northern District of Ohio re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Remand)(Dickerson, Denise) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for an additional thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause, #10 Order,, by Tiny's Construction, LLC. (Harrison, Jean) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties have filed an "agreed order to extend time for Plaintiff to file response to motion to dismiss or transfer." (Doc. No. #9 .) This is a matter for the Court's decision and requires the filing of a motion seeking the desired relief. If there is no opposition to the requested relief, the parties may file a joint motion or state that the motion is unopposed. No extension will be granted unless a motion is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/10/2020. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION - Agreed Order to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Dickerson, Denise) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On August 31, 2020, Defendant Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. ("Ecoverse") filed a motion to dismiss or change venue under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #5 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Campbell unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tiny's Construction, LLC. (Harrison, Jean) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/31/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to Mandatory Forum Selection Clause by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd. (Phillips, J.) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 30, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Britt Phillips, Denise A. Dickerson, and Jean Dyer Harrison. (vh) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) [Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ecoverse Industries, Ltd from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-0674-II. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3204797) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)[Transferred from tnmd on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiny's Construction, LLC v. Ecoverse Industries, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiny's Construction, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jean Dyer Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoverse Industries, LTD
Represented By: J. Britt Phillips
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moeller
Represented By: Keith A. Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?