Harmony Licensing LLC v. ABB, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harmony Licensing LLC
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02443
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (Attachments: #1 Order)(W,Na)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, without prejudice. Related document #13 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/1/2021. (R,Sh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without Prejudice filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/05/2021 for Defendant to answer. ABB, Inc. answer due 3/5/2021. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/1/2021.(R,Sh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/05/2021 to answer filed by Plaintiff Harmony Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 3, 2021 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion)(Folland, Robert)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 3, 2021 to answer Complaint. ABB, Inc. answer due 2/3/2021. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/17/2020.(R,Sh)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/7/2020. (M,S)
December 7, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, Judge Donald C. Nugent terminated. (Y,A)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ABB Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd. for ABB, Inc. filed by ABB, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ABB Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd. for ABB, Inc. filed by ABB, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. ABB, Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 filed on behalf of Harmony Licensing LLC (Curfman, Andrew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Folland filed by on behalf of ABB, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon ABB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - Filed in wrong case. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) Modified on 10/28/2020 (S,AN).
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - Per attorney, typo on form. To be refiled. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) Modified on 10/28/2020 (S,AN).
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Infringement of Patent with jury demand against ABB, Inc. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-10379097. Filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE42219, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Curfman, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 28, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
October 28, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmony Licensing LLC v. ABB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Folland
Represented By: Kyle R. Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony Licensing LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?