UltraPrecision Optics, LLC v. COTSWorks, LLC
Counter Defendant: UltraPrecision Optics, LLC
Counter Claimant: COTSWorks, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02493
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 21 Judgment Entry signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/13/2021. re #20 Order (S,KM)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/13/2021 approving stipulated dismissal with prejudice. re #19 Notice (S,KM)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice of All Claims and Counterclaims filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Callam, Kelly)
August 12, 2021 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 12:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. (S,KM)
June 9, 2021 Filing 18 Joint Motion for protective order filed by Plaintiff UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Understanding and Agreement to Be Bound)(Brown, Brandon)
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Motion to Transfer and Consolidate, filed by COTSWorks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Filed Motion). (Davis, Austin)
May 25, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure of Expert Witness filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Robert Rickenbach). (Brown, Brandon)
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Austin N. Davis filed by on behalf of COTSWorks, LLC. (Davis, Austin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Kelly A. Callam filed by on behalf of UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Callam, Kelly)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Brown, Brandon)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/1/2021. The plaintiff(s) shall identify experts, if any, by May 17, 2021. The defendant(s) is to identify experts, if any, by May 31, 2021. (S,KM)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/1/2021. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2021, with Responses due 7/26/2021 and Replies due by 8/2/2021. Status Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 12:00 PM and Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 12:00 PM, both to be held in Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. Discovery due by 9/20/2021. Jury Trial assigned on a two week stand-by basis beginning on 10/4/2021 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 18A. (S,KM)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 Minutes of Case Management Conference before Judge James S. Gwin held on 4/1/2021. (Court Reporter: None;Time: 50 minutes) (S,KM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Brown, Brandon)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to #5 Counterclaim filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Brown, Brandon)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/24/2021 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's Counterclaim UltraPrecision Optics, LLC until 3/1/2021.(S,KM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2021 to answer Defendant's Counterclaim, filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. Related document(s) #5 . (Brown, Brandon)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/2/2021 setting a case management conference on 4/1/2021 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin.IMPORTANT: The Court requires the attendance of 1) all named parties, 2) lead counsel, and 3) a representative with full settlement authority (Attachments: #1 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against UltraPrecision Optics, LLC filed by COTSWorks, LLC. (Slater, James)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon COTSWorks, LLC. (S,SR)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Brown, Brandon)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against COTSWorks, LLC. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-10396865. Filed by UltraPrecision Optics, LLC. (Attachments: #1Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Manufacture and Supply Agreement between parties) (Brown, Brandon) s/ by Colleen M. ONeil. Modified text on 11/10/2020 (S,SR).
November 4, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (Y,A)
November 4, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UltraPrecision Optics, LLC v. COTSWorks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: UltraPrecision Optics, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Earl Brown
Represented By: Colleen M. O'Neil
Represented By: Kelly A. Callam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: COTSWorks, LLC
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Cory N Barnes
Represented By: Austin N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?