Kotoch v. Grossinger City Toyota et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Kotoch
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Toyota Financial Services, Trans Union LLC, Grossinger City Toyota, Toyota Motor Credit Corp. and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02538
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 23 Answer to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions. (Pike, Bryon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 22 Answer to Complaint #1 and affirmative and additional defenses, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Wallace, David)
December 23, 2020 Filing 21 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/4/2021 at 03:00 PM and will be conducted telephonically due to the Covid-19 pandemic. The Court will provide the parties and counsel dial-in information via email prior to the call. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 12/23/2020. #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A).
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 Answer to Complaint #1 filed by Grossinger City Toyota. (Tipping, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff, filed by Joseph Kotoch. (Todd, Joni)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] vacating #18 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case Management Conference will be scheduled at a later date. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 12/18/2020. (Y,A)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, at 2:30 PM and will be conducted telephonically due to the Covid-19 pandemic. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed because not all deadlines may be contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties)(Y,A)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Toyota Financial Services, Toyota Motor Credit Corp. (Joseph, John)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of case reassignment to Judge J. Philip Calabrese pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on December 7, 2020. (M,MT)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/24/20 to answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Grossinger City Toyota answer due 12/24/2020. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/30/2020.(R,Sh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Order for Extension of Time until December 24, 2020 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Grossinger City Toyota. Related document(s) #15 . (Tipping, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/24/20 to answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Grossinger City Toyota. (Tipping, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Grossinger City Toyota. (Tipping, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance by Counsel for Defendant, Grossinger City Toyota filed by Grossinger City Toyota. (Tipping, Christopher)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Toyotas' #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 16, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint Toyota Financial Services answer due 12/16/2020; Toyota Motor Credit Corp. answer due 12/16/2020.. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/20/2020.(R,Sh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 16, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corp.. (Joseph, John)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #8 , #10 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions answers due 12/31/2020. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/18/2020.(R,Sh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Information Service LLC for Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Wallace, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/31/20 to answer filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Wallace, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by David A. Wallace filed by on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Wallace, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 18, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion)(Pike, Bryon)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
November 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
November 12, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions filed by Experian Information Solutions. (Pike, Bryon)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Bryon A. Pike filed by on behalf of Experian Information Solutions. (Pike, Bryon)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC filed by Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by William M. Huse filed by on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas Cuyahoga County, Ohio, case number CV 20 939375 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10412661.. Filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint To Trans Union, LLC, #4 Exhibit C - Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Consent To Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Equifax Information Services LLC's Consent To Removal, #6 Exhibit E - Toyota Financial Services' Consent To Removal, #7 Exhibit F - Toyota Motor Credit Corp.'s Consent To Removal) (Huse, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotoch v. Grossinger City Toyota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions
Represented By: Bryon A. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Represented By: John E. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: William M. Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossinger City Toyota
Represented By: Christopher A. Tipping
Represented By: Julie A. Bickis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corp.
Represented By: John E. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Represented By: Tyler K. Ibom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kotoch
Represented By: Joni Todd
Represented By: Peter Turner
Represented By: Matthew D. Golish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?