Parkinson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kandy Sue Parkinson
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02603
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/31/2020. Upon representation of counsel that the case has been settled between the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the docket be marked, "settled and dismissed with prejudice. Any subsequent order setting forth different terms and conditions relative to the settlement and dismissal of the within action shall supersede the within order. FURTHER, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to resolve disputes concerning the memorialization of this settlement agreement. re #51 (S,KM)
December 18, 2020 Filing 52 Joint Motion for extension until 2/1/2021 to file dismissal papers, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda)
December 11, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of cancellation of status conference on 12/14/2020. The Court directs parties to file dismissal paperwork by 12/27/2020. (S,KM)
December 10, 2020 Filing 51 Joint Notice to Court of Pending Settlement filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda)
December 7, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. (S,KM)
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 Motion by Christy D. Jones, David B. Thomas, Susan M. Robinson, Kari L. Sutherland and William M. Gage (MDL Attorneys) to withdraw as attorney filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 Attorney Appearance by Brenda A. Sweet filed by on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 47 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Steinmetz filed by on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/20/2020. (R,Sh)
November 20, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (Y,A)
November 19, 2020 Filing 45 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
November 19, 2020 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:14-cv-16314. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 19, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (W,CM)
November 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (W,CM)
November 19, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson are reminded to file a corporate disclosure statement. (W,CM)
November 19, 2020 Copy of Docket Sheet and #45 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Christy D. Jones, Butler Snow - Jackson, Ste. 1700, 210 East Capitol Street, P.O. Box 22567, Jackson, MS 39225-2567; David B. Thomas, Thomas Combs & Spann, Ste. 1380, 300 Summers Street, P.O. Box 25301, Charleston, WV 25338-3824; Kari L. Sutherland, Butler Snow, P. O. Box 1138, Oxford, MS 38655; Susan M. Robinson Thomas Combs & Spann, P.O. Box 3824, Charleston, WV 25338; William M. Gage Butler Snow, P. O. Box 6010, Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010 on 11/19/20. (W,CM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2649) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 42 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2724) - Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8496) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8609) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 41 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2695) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8481) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8608) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carols Felix)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 40 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6887) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6897) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7027) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8497) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8629) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1987) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1987) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1987) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1989) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2168) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2207) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2657) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Duane Priddy, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3652) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3652) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3652) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3652) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3652) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3656) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3753) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3854) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8522) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8597) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Duane Priddy)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8523) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8592) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 37 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1996) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1997) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2167) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2222) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2683) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Donald R. Ostergard, M.D., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2814) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2816) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2950) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3011) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8537) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8594) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (166) letter to Court, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) - Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (303) PTO 20, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (756) PTO 63)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 11/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 11/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #33 NOTICE of Ongoing Treatment of Plaintiff, NOTICE of Withdrawal of Certain Causes of Action and RESPONSE by Kandy Sue Parkinson to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment ERROR: Incorrect image of Exhibit 2 attached; page 26 was upside-down. CORRECTION: Removed and replaced Exhibit 2. (slr) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition of Plaintiff, Redacted by Kandy Sue Parkinson (Attachment: #1 Transcript)(Oliver, Jami) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Ongoing Treatment of Plaintiff, NOTICE of Withdrawal of Certain Causes of Action and RESPONSE by Kandy Sue Parkinson to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Oliver, Jami) (Modified on 5/22/2020 to remove and replace Exhibit 2)(slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Kandy Sue Parkinson in opposition to #30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike and/or Limit the Case-Testimony of Daniel R. Ostergard, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Oliver, Jami) (Modified on 8/30/2019 to remove link to #31)(slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike, or Alternatively, to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Daniel R. Ostergard, M.D. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike, or Alternatively, to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Daniel R. Ostergard, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Firouz Daneshgari on 7/30/19 at 10:00 a.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kandy Sue Parkinson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Oliver, Jami) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Matthew Barber on 5/30/19 at 8:00 a.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Matthew Barber on 5/30/19 at 8:00 a.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kandy Sue Parkinson for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant, Ethicon Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents. (Oliver, Jami) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kandy Parkinson on 4/3/19 at 11:00 a.m. EDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Kandy Sue Parkinson. (Oliver, Jami) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
October 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket). (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4422 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
June 29, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Withdraw #6 MOTION for Sanctions, and denying as moot #6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/2/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Withdraw #6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
June 26, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
January 7, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 28, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 15, 2014 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 116 (THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER ON SECOND ROUND OF BELLWETHERS Huskey and Edwards ) entered on 05/06/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 13, 2014 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ethicon, LLC, #2 Summons to Johnson & Johnson) (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]
May 13, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3208248. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkinson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Brenda A. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Brenda A. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Brenda A. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandy Sue Parkinson
Represented By: Jami S. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?