Public Service Insurance Company v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Public Service Insurance Company
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Actavis Kadian LLC, McKesson Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., American Geriatric Society, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., David A. Sackler, Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Bellco Drug Corp., Walgreens Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Kathe A. Sackler, Endo International plc, Noramco Inc, Jonathan D. Sackler, Michael M. Baylson, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, American Academy of Pain Medicine, Inc., American Pain Society, Inc. and Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45015
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Eric S. Pasternack filed on behalf of Plaintiff. (P,R)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Defendant American Pain Society, Inc. filed by Public Service Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Coren, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-05904. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-128). Re: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theNorthern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with theconsent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (fdc) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Cancellation of HearingPLEASE BE ADVISED THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 16, 2020 AT 2PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON IS CANCELED.(lds, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED A "LITIGATION HOLD" WILL BE PLACED ON ALL RELEVANT DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION, AND OTHER EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS WHICH ARE ARGUABLY SUBJECT TO DISCOVERY IN THIS CASE. THE COURT WILL HAVE A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ON 1/16/2020 AT 2:00 PM. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/19/2019. 12/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM MARK LANIER TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE ( ECF NO. #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/19/2019.12/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND ATTORNEY WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 12/20/2019 (nd, ). [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/16/2020 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. (sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice William Mark Lanier, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13998577.) filed by PUBLIC SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(COREN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/18/19. 12/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(lisad, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL COREN on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY (COREN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PAIN MEDICINE, INC., AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY, AMERICAN PAIN SOCIETY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, STUART D. BAKER, BELLCO DRUG CORP., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., KINRAY, LLC, ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., OTRTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN, PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., WALGREENS CO., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208277.), filed by PUBLIC SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY.(bw, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PUBLIC SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY. (bw, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]
December 13, 2019 40 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PAIN MEDICINE, INC., AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY, AMERICAN PAIN SOCIETY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, STUART D. BAKER, BELLCO DRUG CORP., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., KINRAY, LLC, ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., OTRTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN, PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., WALGREENS CO., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/17/2019 (bw, ) [Transferred from paed on 1/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Service Insurance Company v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Geriatric Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. Baylson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Pain Medicine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pain Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Service Insurance Company
Represented By: Stewart L. Cohen
Represented By: Michael Coren
Represented By: W. Mark Lanier
Represented By: Eric S. Pasternack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?