City of Anadarko v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City of Anadarko
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Actavis plc, Keysource Medical, Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Anda Inc, McKesson Corp., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2020op45022
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 38 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00815. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE (other) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc of Firm Name Change (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case sent to the Northern District of Ohio (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 36 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case filed by Anadarko City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 33 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Jenks Stay Order, #7 Exhibit JPML 5622 CTO, #8 Exhibit Wis Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #10 Exhibit KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 Cty Transfer Orer, #15 Exhibit JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit Alameda Stay Order, #17 Exhibit Portland Stay Order, #18 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Cal Stay Order, #21 Exhibit Ill Stay Order, #22 Exhibit Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Ohio Order on Kentucky's Motion to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Expedite by Anadarko City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand by Anadarko City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel M Delluomo on behalf of Anadarko City of (Delluomo, Daniel) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE (other) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Sanford C Coats withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) Modified on 9/25/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sanford C. Coats by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It Is Herby Ordered that the named Manufacturer Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (60) days after the later of anentry of: 1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to Caddo County District Court, Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/12/2019. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 12, 2019 NOTICE from the Court re #19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. ALL COUNSEL are DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply w/LCvR7.1(d) - "For all pleadings, motions, and briefs the print style, including footnotes, shall not be less than 13-point type...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Docket Annotation: The docket text for the order at doc. no. 15 has been modified to conform to the wording of the order. The nef for doc. no. 15 will be regenerated to counsel. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Dfts McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, The Harvard Drug Group LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plf's petition not later than 60 days following the later of 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/10/2019. (ac) Modified on 9/10/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 4, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2990719. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Caddo County, case number CJ-2019-23 filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 1 - Docket, #2 2 - Petition, #3 3 - Summons, #4 4- Return of Service (Johnson & Johnson), #5 5- Return of Service (Purdue Pharma), #6 6- Entry of Appearance (AmerisourceBergenMcBride-Huntsman), #7 7- Entry of Appearance (CardinalRay), #8 8 - Entry of Appearance (HarvardRay), #9 9 - Return of Service (AmerisourceBergen)., #10 10- Return of Service (Cardinal), #11 11 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #12 12- Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Manufacturer Defendants), #13 13- Entry of Appearance (Johnson-OrthoRidgeway), #14 14- Entry of Appearance (McKessonSDC & KDM), #15 15- Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (McKesson), #16 16- Return of Service (McKesson), #17 17- Summonses (31), #18 18- LCvR7.1., #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) [Transferred from okwd on 1/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Anadarko v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Michael Hampton
Represented By: Amy Jo Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Anadarko
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Represented By: Daniel M. Delluomo
Represented By: Steven W. Crow
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?