The County of Fayette, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The County of Fayette, Ohio and The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jane Does 1-50, Cephalon Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy 10-3251, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2020op45065
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kroger Limited Partnership II waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa)
May 7, 2020 Filing 34 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants and Jury Demand against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) CVS TN Distribution, LLC; The Kroger Co.; Kroger Limited Partnership II; Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy 10-3251; Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse; Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45. Filed by The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade, The County of Fayette, Ohio. (Saltzburg, Lisa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance of Linda Singer by Lisa M. Saltzburg filed by on behalf of The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Saltzburg, Lisa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 Attorney Appearance by Lisa M. Saltzburg filed by on behalf of The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Saltzburg, Lisa)
February 11, 2020 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-04347. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Exhaustive List of Cases) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Plaintiffs' Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Worcester, MA Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - Illinois Public Risk Fund Remand Order, #3 Exhibit C - New Hampshire Hearing Transcript Excerpt, Nov. 6, 2017, #4 Exhibit D - Dallas County, TX Remand Order, #5 Exhibit E - Delta County, TX Remand Order, #6 Exhibit F - Van Zandt, TX Remand Order, #7 Exhibit G - Brooke County Commission, VA Stay Denial, #8 Exhibit H - Weber County, UT Stay Denial, #9 Exhibit I - Uintah County, UT et al. Stay Denial, #10 Exhibit J - Cambridge, MA Remand Order, #11 Exhibit K - Mecklenberg County, VA Memo & Remand Order, #12 Exhibit L - Greeneville County, SC Remand Order, #13 Exhibit M - Anderson County, SC Remand Order, #14 Exhibit MDL Doc. 736 - McKesson's Notice of Consent to Remand, #15 Exhibit MDL Doc. 904 - Cardinal's Notice of Consent to Remand, #16 Exhibit P - Commonwealth of Kentucky - AmerisourceBergen's Notice of Consent to Remand, #17 Exhibit Q - MDL Teleconference Transcript Excerpts, Dec. 13, 2017) (Davis, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Remand and For Expedited Consideration filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Illinois Public Risk Fund Remand Order, #2 Exhibit B - El Monte, CA Remand Order, #3 Exhibit C - County of Kern, CA Remand Order, #4 Exhibit D - Fire & Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio Remand Order, #5 Exhibit E - City of Worcester v. Purdue Pharma L.P. Opinion Re Motion to Remand) (Davis, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Remand and For Expedited Consideration filed by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Teleconference Transcript Excerpts, Dec. 13, 2017) (Davis, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fayette County CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit 3 - MDL 2804 Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fayette Co. CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transfer Order 1, #6 Exhibit 6 - Noble County OH, #7 Exhibit 7 - Meigs County OH, #8 Exhibit 8 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Portland ME Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Melrose Park Ill. Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Jacksonville Fla. Deferral Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Delaware Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Osage OK Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Int'l Union Stay Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Jenks OK Stay Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - Seminole County - Stay Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - EDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit 19 - WDVA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Fauquier VA Stay Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - Prince Williams VA Stay Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - Order Granting Mtn to Stay, #23 Exhibit 23 - San Mateo Cal. Stay Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/16/2019. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall have until the later of thirty (30) days after: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand (if one is filed); or (2) the entry of a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this action to the MDL, to answer or move to dismiss the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/15/2019. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/15/2019. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and for Expedited Consideration, #2 Exhibit Remand Orders) (Davis, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Rice, Justin) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Johnson & Johnson. (Rice, Justin) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Davis, Donald) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER re 13 Notation Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Moving Defendants must answer or move to dismiss the Complaint by 30 days after a Court's decision on Plaintiffs' potential Motion to Remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/9/2019. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint. CVS Health Corporation answer due 11/6/2019; CVS Indiana, L.L.C. answer due 11/6/2019; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Cephalon, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Johnson & Johnson answer due 11/6/2019; Mallinckrodt, LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Ohio CVS Stores, LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. answer due 11/6/2019; Purdue Pharma, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; SpecGx LLC answer due 11/6/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. answer due 11/6/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co. answer due 11/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/8/2019. (agm) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Callum Morris for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Morris, Callum) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines (Based on doc #6 ): AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 10/28/2019; Cardinal Health, Inc. answer due 10/28/2019; McKesson Corporation answer due 10/28/2019. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. New date requested 11/6/2019. (Rice, Justin) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket and Pleadings) (Holzhall, Vincent) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (er). [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant McKesson Corporation of State Court Order Filed September 25, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade, The County of Fayette, Ohio. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Fayette County, Ohio, case number CVG 20190261 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7132831), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers and Complaint) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Fayette, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher C. Hollon
Represented By: Erin E. Rhinehart
Represented By: Callum Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy 10-3251
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Fayette, Ohio
Represented By: Jess Carter Weade
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade
Represented By: Jess Carter Weade
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?