Williams v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sonji B Williams
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., jonathan Sackler, Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Med-Turn Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc., David Sackler, Eckerd Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Inmar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45073
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Western. Case number 3:20-cv-00058. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 11, 2020 Filing 22 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to Northern District of Ohio, MDL# 2804 (CTO- 133). Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting as outlined #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; finding as moot #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , and #17 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. The time by which all properly served Defendants are required to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admission is extended until 60 days following the later of two events: a. This Court rules on a motion to remand, if any such motion is timely made; and b. A final decision by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) regarding transfer of this action to MDL No. 2804, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation (MDL No. 2804). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 02/11/2020. (brj) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sonji B Williams (White, Adam) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lee White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Adam) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Helms, Howard) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Mullins, Allison) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, and Discovery Requests by McKesson Corporation. (Williams, Kevin) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Helms, Howard) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Graebe, Christopher) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company. (Graebe, Christopher) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Graebe on behalf of The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company (Graebe, Christopher) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Response to Complaint) by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kari) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Discovery Requests by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Eckerd Corporation answer due 3/9/2020; Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc. answer due 3/9/2020. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/30/2020. (Prichard, Daniel) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Russwurm Johnson on behalf of Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc. (Johnson, Kari) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Callais Allen on behalf of Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc. (Allen, Michael) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ward Jackson on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Jackson, Christopher) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Packer, Leslie) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex John Hagan on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C. (Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation (Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-5192. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4360054), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Orders entered in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit Remainder of State Court file)(Hagan, Alex) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) [Transferred from ncwd on 2/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Christopher T. Graebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Howard Brent Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Guy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bailey King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Alexander L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Turn Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lager Winters
Represented By: Jason M. Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Callais Allen
Represented By: Kari Russwurm Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Represented By: Michael Callais Allen
Represented By: Kari Russwurm Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher C. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmar, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Lager Winters
Represented By: Jason M. Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonji B Williams
Represented By: Paul D. Coates
Represented By: Garry Whitaker
Represented By: Adam Lee White
Represented By: Marcus Robert Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?