Lafourche Parish Government v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Lafourche Parish Government
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan PLC, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Walgreen Company, Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Florida, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Salt Lake City, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Indivior Inc., Cephalon Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Noramco Inc, Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, Actavis Inc, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45212
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Morris & Dickson Holding Co., L.L.C. for Morris & Dickson Co LLC filed by Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Frank H. Spruiell, Jr filed by on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)Related document(s) #14 .(Spruiell, Frank)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-01942. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order of MDL Transfer to Northen District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Indivior Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Indivior Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text/removed referral & submission date on 7/17/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lafourche Parish Government. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Actavis LLC identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as Corporate Parent for Actavis LLC. (Crisler, Richard) Modified text/added Corporate Parent on 7/14/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Actavis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crisler, Richard) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by McKesson Corporation. By the Clerk. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District, Lafourche Parish, case number 140839 C (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8394240) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit-Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings) Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/9/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafourche Parish Government v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc., Florida
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc., Salt Lake City
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Russell R. Dickson
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafourche Parish Government
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Santana
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Matthew S. Landry
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Represented By: Wesley J Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?