City of Orlando, Florida v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: The City of Orlando, Florida
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Actavis Kadian LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, HealthMart Systems, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Express Scripts Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Walmart Inc., UnitedHealthcare Group Incorporated, Allergan Sales LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., Endo International plc, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Noramco Inc, Cardinal Health 7, LLC, H.D. Smith LLC, CVS Vero FL Distribution LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45223
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 77 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 6:20-cv-00736. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 Filing 76 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number: 2804 (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay; ruling deferred #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is STAYED pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on whether to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL. The parties are DIRECTED to immediately notify the Court upon the JPML's transfer decision. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/15/2020. (BIA)(ctp) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ENDORSED ORDER granting #73 Motion for Extension of Time To File Response. The deadline for the moving defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to 14 days after the issuance of an order on the #6 Motion To Remand. If no order on the transfer of this case to the national opiate multidistrict litigation has issued by that time, the parties may seek another extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/15/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 73 Joint Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 6/15/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 72 Remark: Doc. #71 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/29/20. (MT) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc... (Gamm, Paul) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER granting #69 Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines. The Court extends the deadlines for the parties to conduct a case management conference and to file a case management report until the Court determines whether this action will remain before the Court. If the Court denies the pending motion to remand (Doc. #6 ), the parties must file their case management report within fourteen (14) days of that order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/21/2020. (MT) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Extend Case Management Deadlines filed jointly with other Defendants by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 68 Remark: Docs. #48 , #51 , #56 , #57 , #59 , #60 , and #62 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/18/20. (MT) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed jointly with Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation filed by The City of Orlando, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Young, James) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Noramco, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Marquardt, Christopher) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 17, 2020 Filing 65 Remark: Docs. #44 and #45 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/15/20. (MT) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 17, 2020 Filing 64 Remark: Docs. #36 , #37 , #41 , and #43 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/14/20. (MT) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related case(s): y (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Pratico, Steven) Modified on 5/19/2020 (BIA). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for HealthMart Systems, Inc... (Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Noramco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SK Groundhog Holdings LP, Other Affiliate Noramco, LLC, Other Affiliate Purisys, Other Affiliate Tasmanian Alkaloids for Noramco, Inc... (Marquardt, Christopher) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Furness, Amy) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Pratico, Steven) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Furness, Amy) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Pratico, Steven) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Carl Marquardt on behalf of Noramco, Inc. (Marquardt, Christopher) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Pharmaceutical Prime Vendor Contract, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Declaration of Lori White in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Order Denying Remand)(Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re: #8 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The City of Orlando, Florida. Related case(s): y (Young, James) Modified on 5/18/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re: #9 Interested Persons Order by The City of Orlando, Florida. (Young, James) Modified on 5/18/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. Related case(s): y (Murphy, J.) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Murphy, J.) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 7, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Vitale, Michael) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Related case(s): yes (Gulde, Virginia) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gulde, Virginia) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Corporate Parent WSE Investment LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.. (Lomax, Christopher) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 7, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. (Vitale, Michael) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC, may have until and through June 29, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/13/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re: #9 Interested Persons Order by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Hearn, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re: #8 Related Case Order by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SpecGx LLC. Related case(s): yes (Hearn, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lerner, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re: #8 Related Case Order and Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by H.D. Smith, LLC. Related case(s): y (Lerner, Joshua) Modified on 5/13/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Amerisource Bergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Lerner, Joshua) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, LLC, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C., Holiday CVS L.L.C.. (Hasbun, Marcos) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER striking #32 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. If the parties intend to file a motion for leave to substitute attorney, they are directed to review Local Rules 2.03 and 3.01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/12/2020. (JLE) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #33 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court reminds counsel that the meet-and-confer obligation applies both to counsel for Plaintiff as well as counsel for Defendants. The failure of either side to engage in the process in good faith may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/12/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time for Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC to Respond to the Complaint)(Lerner, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 32 STRICKEN PER ORDER AT 35 : MOTION to Substitute Attorney Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Noramco, Inc.. (Marquardt, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 5/13/2020 (KNC). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcos E. Hasbun on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, LLC, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C., Holiday CVS L.L.C. (Hasbun, Marcos) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 7, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Answer to the Complaint due 6/29/2020. (KNC) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Moving Defendants may have until and through June 29, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/8/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/20 to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Distributor Defendants by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pratico, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 5/8/2020 (LDJ). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Dodek Lerner on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Lerner, Joshua) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER to strike #21 Notice of Circuit Court Order, filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. The Notice does not seek any form of relief from the Court. The Court will consider any issues related to deadlines only upon motion and after the opposing party has had an opportunity to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/6/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to counsel Catherine D. Payne of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. Answer due by 6/18/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, SpecGx LLC. Answer due by 6/24/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. Answer due by 7/6/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc. Answer due by 7/9/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Noramco, Inc. Answer due by 7/1/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc. Answer due by 7/1/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Reset deadline as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 5/15/2020 (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Moving Defendants may have until and through the dates listed for each in paragraph 4 of the Motion to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/5/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff states that it "takes no position on Defendants request to extend the deadline for them to Respond to the Complaint." Therefore, the Court will construe the Motion as unopposed. Defendants Walmart and Walgreens may have until and through July 1, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/5/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal of Certain Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gulde, Virginia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Confirmation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by The City of Orlando, Florida. (Young, James) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 21 (STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 27) NOTICE of Circuit Court Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint Until June 29, 2020 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Pratico, Steven) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (LDJ). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Vitale on behalf of Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 112, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 7, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC (Vitale, Michael) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Reconsideration re 10 Order on Motion to Expedite. The Court's May 4, 2020 Order (Doc. 10) is VACATED. The deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. 6) is Friday, May 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/5/2020. (BIA) (ctp) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #17 Defendants Walmart and Walgreen's Motion for Confirmation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint. On its face, the Motion asks the Court to confirm that FRCP 81(c) applies in this case. The Court so confirms. However, the Motion also appears to ask the Court to give effect to the parties' private agreement to extend the deadline by which to file a responsive pleading. The Court will not do so, but will construe the Motion as a request for an extension of time. Plaintiff appears to oppose the Motion, though the Local Rule 3.01(g) certification does not explicitly say so. Therefore, Plaintiff is directed to respond to the Motion on or by May 6, 2020. The deadline for Walmart and Walgreens to file a responsive pleading is stayed pending resolution of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/5/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Confirmation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service of Process (Walmart), #2 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service of Process (Walgreens))(Lomax, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by The City of Orlando, Florida re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Young, James) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (LDJ). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #12 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Confirmation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint. The Court also notes that the failure to seek an extension until the last minute does not constitute an "emergency." Counsel are advised that the designation "emergency" may cause the court to abandon other pending matters in order to immediately address the "emergency," and the court may sanction any counsel or party who designates a motion as an "emergency" under circumstances that are not a true emergency. The undersigned's website discusses what constitutes an emergency. Defendants are granted leave to file another, non-emergency motion that fully complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/5/2020. (Kidd, Embry) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 10 Order on Motion to Expedite filed jointly with Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed jointly with Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by HealthMart Systems, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Confirmation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,, Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service of Process (Walmart), #2 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service of Process (Walgreens))(Lomax, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Set deadline as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 5/8/2020. (LDJ) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Scott Weiselberg and Renee Cook of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (VACATED per Order #19 ) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. The response is due on or before Friday, May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/4/2020. (MT) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (LDJ). [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/1/2020. (BIA) (ctp) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court by The City of Orlando, Florida. (Young, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Orlando, Florida. (Young, James) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:20-cv-736-ORL-37EJK. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 4/30/2020. (SC) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Pratico, Steven) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-736-Orl-18EJK. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, FL, case number 2020-CA-001629-O filed in State Court on 02/12/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16753158 filed by McKesson Corporation, HealthMart Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from flmd on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Orlando, Florida v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Francisco Ramos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthMart Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Represented By: Francisco Ramos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jay Gamm
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Laplante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: J. Logan Murphy
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 112, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Lee Gulde
Represented By: David K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 107, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jay Gamm
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Laplante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Chance Lyman
Represented By: Steven Charles Pratico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Virginia Lee Gulde
Represented By: David K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales LLC
Represented By: J. Logan Murphy
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday CVS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Paul Jay Gamm
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Laplante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 7, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Joshua Dodek Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Vero FL Distribution LLC
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Martha Leibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Orlando, Florida
Represented By: Robert C. Gilbert
Represented By: Eugene K. Pettis
Represented By: Debra Potter Klauber
Represented By: Juan Martinez
Represented By: James Dennis Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?