Dade County v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Dade County
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, 1-1000 Does, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, john kappor, Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Amerisource Bergen Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Actavis Inc, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sandoz Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45224
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-00598. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Dade County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Dade County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice: by Plaintiff Dade County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/8/2020. (TMT) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC... (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Dade County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Polster's 2-16-18 Order Regarding Remands)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Dade County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Actavis Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmeriSource Bergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Kappor, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Ortho-McNeil Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., SPECGX LLC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/14/2020.)(TMT) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/1/20. (CDP) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Dade County.(BAK) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty Second Judicial Circuit - St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00498, with receipt number AMOEDC-7893970, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #5 Original Filing Form with attachments)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dade County v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-1000 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: john kappor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dade County
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?