Town Of Cottage City et al v. Allergan plc et al
Plaintiff: Town Of Cottage City, The Town of Upper Marlboro, TOWN OF NORTH BRENTWOOD and THE TOWN OF FOREST HEIGHTS
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., MedStar Southern Maryland Hospital Center, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis plc, Giant Food Stores, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Does 1 through 1000, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Mylan N.V., Safeway Inc., Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Dimensions Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Hospira Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Indivior Inc., Cephalon Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Accokeek Drug and Health Care, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Pharmacy Corporation of America doing business as Pharmerica, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Pharmedium Services LLC, John Kapoor, Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Actavis Inc, Doctor's Hospital, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45235
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 59 Certification of Filing of State Court Documents filed by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Documents), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Documents), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Documents))(Heard, Frank)
August 19, 2020 Filing 58 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 8:20-cv-00796. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2020 Filing 57 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of Panel. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Remand filed by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood.(Sandler, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION re #3 Complaint Initial Responsive Pleading Deadline by Giant Food Stores, LLC(Kracht, Torsten) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION re #3 Complaint Initial Responsive Pleading Deadline by Doctor's Hospital, Inc.(Mudd, Erica) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 52 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MedStar Southern Maryland Hospital Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MedStar Health, Inc. for MedStar Southern Maryland Hospital Center, Inc..(Ellison, James) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 51 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Safeway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, Inc. for Safeway, Inc..(Citera, Francis) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A Citera on behalf of Safeway, Inc. (Citera, Francis) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A Citera on behalf of Safeway, Inc. (Citera, Francis) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 48 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Giant Food Stores, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V., Other Affiliate GIANT CARLISLE HOLDING, LLC, Other Affiliate Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Ahold Delhaize America Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Ahold Central Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Ahold U.S.A. Inc., Other Affiliate Ahold Delhaize Investment Holding, Inc. for Giant Food Stores, LLC.(Kracht, Torsten) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 47 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pharmedium Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent PharMEDium Healthcare, LLC for Pharmedium Services, LLC.(Mitchell, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Renae Mitchell on behalf of Pharmedium Services, LLC (Mitchell, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 45 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dimensions Health Corporation identifying Other Affiliate University of Maryland Medical Systems Corporation for Dimensions Health Corporation.(Lanier, Daniel) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 44 QC NOTICE: #43 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Dimensions Health Corporation was filed incorrectly. **All affilations must be entered into the CM/ECF system when filing under this event. Please re-file and enter the name of affiliation in the name field/box when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 43 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dimensions Health Corporation (Lanier, Daniel) Modified on 4/15/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Amended Statement) filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc..(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (AMENDED) from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL20-08814., filed by Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC.(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Francis A Citera. Directing attorney Francis A Citera to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Ellison on behalf of MedStar Southern Maryland Hospital Center, Inc. (Ellison, James) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 38 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis A. Citera by Safeway, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Sklaire, Michael) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 37 QC NOTICE: #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Safeway, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis A. Citera (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8605642.) by Safeway, Inc.(Sklaire, Michael) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 35 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc..(Prawde, Alyse) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MARGINAL ORDER approving #33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Town of North Brentwood, The Town of Upper Marlboro, The Town of Forest Heights, Town Of Cottage City; DIRECTING clerk to terminate Hospira, Inc. as a Defendant. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/8/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood (Harlan, Eric) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy R Krum on behalf of Doctor's Hospital, Inc. (Krum, Jeremy) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand Action to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 30 QC NOTICE re: #27 Notice of Appearance filed by Doctor's Hospital, Inc. **The appearance of Erica C. Mudd, Esquire has been entered successfully. However, Jeremy R. Krum, Esquire must file separatley using his own CM/ECF log-in and password for the system to recognize his appearance. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 29 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Doctor's Hospital, Inc. (Mudd, Erica) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Doctor's Hospital, Inc. Consent to Removal (Mudd, Erica) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica C Mudd on behalf of Doctor's Hospital, Inc. (Mudd, Erica) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Drumheller Butler on behalf of Dimensions Health Corporation (Butler, Holly) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Lanier on behalf of Dimensions Health Corporation (Lanier, Daniel) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Dimensions Health Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent to Removal (Lanier, Daniel) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Mitchell, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Renae Mitchell on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Mitchell, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Safeway, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Albertsons Companies Inc. for Safeway, Inc..(Sklaire, Michael) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint as to Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/2/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Giant Food Stores, LLC of Consent to Removal (Kracht, Torsten) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Torsten M Kracht on behalf of Giant Food Stores, LLC (Kracht, Torsten) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Helen Cho. Directing attorney Helen Cho to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey H Reeves. Directing attorney Jeffrey H Reeves to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cheryl Priest Ainsworth. Directing attorney Cheryl Priest Ainsworth to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Other Affiliate CVS Health Corporation for Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(O Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc..(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Electronic Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, William) Modified on 4/2/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Helen Cho (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8593914.) by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood(Harlan, Eric) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey H. Reeves (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8593887.) by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood(Harlan, Eric) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cheryl Priest Ainsworth (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8593839.) by The Town of Forest Heights, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town Of Cottage City, Town of North Brentwood(Harlan, Eric) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Anne Trasatti on behalf of SpecGx LLC (Trasatti, Marisa) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SpecGx LLC (Trasatti, Marisa) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/27/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Town Of Cottage City, The Town of Upper Marlboro, Town of North Brentwood, The Town of Forest Heights. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report) (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Allegiance Corporation for Cardinal Health 200, LLC ; Other Affiliate Cardinal Health, Inc., Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 108, LLC for Cardinal Health 128, LLC; Other Affiliate Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC.(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Prince George's County, case number CAL 20-08814. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8588754), filed by Cardinal Health 128, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 107, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 121, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Summons to Cardinal Defendants, #4 Exhibit State Court Information Report)(McDaniel, William) [Transferred from mdd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town Of Cottage City et al v. Allergan plc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedStar Southern Maryland Hospital Center, Inc.
Represented By: James P Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Kevin Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Food Stores, LLC
Represented By: Torsten M Kracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Sklaire
Represented By: Francis A. Citera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 121, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 128, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 107, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimensions Health Corporation
Represented By: Holly Drumheller Butler
Represented By: Daniel R Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Kevin Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Represented By: Frank Lane Heard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accokeek Drug and Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Corporation of America doing business as Pharmerica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Maraya Pratt
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmedium Services LLC
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Kevin Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O Croinin
Represented By: Daniel P Moylan
Represented By: John Michael Pardoe
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor's Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy R Krum
Represented By: Erica C Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town Of Cottage City
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Reeves
Represented By: Paul M. Sandler
Represented By: Eric R. Harlan
Represented By: Helen Cho
Represented By: Joel I Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Upper Marlboro
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Reeves
Represented By: Paul M. Sandler
Represented By: Eric R. Harlan
Represented By: Helen Cho
Represented By: Joel I Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWN OF NORTH BRENTWOOD
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Reeves
Represented By: Paul M. Sandler
Represented By: Eric R. Harlan
Represented By: Helen Cho
Represented By: Joel I Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TOWN OF FOREST HEIGHTS
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Reeves
Represented By: Paul M. Sandler
Represented By: Eric R. Harlan
Represented By: Helen Cho
Represented By: Joel I Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?