City of El Reno v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: El Reno City of
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Indivior PLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., SAJ Distributors, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Indivior Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corp., CVS Health Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp doing business as Hikma, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45252
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:20-cv-00852. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2020 Docket Annotation: CIV-20-852-JD electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (knt) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (knt) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court extends the deadline for Smith Drug to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition [Doc. No. 1-3] until forty-five (45) days after the later of (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/03/2020. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Relief Under LCvR83.3(c). Mr. Dougherty is relieved from the requirements of LCvR83.3(a), and may represent Smith Drug in this action without associating with local counsel, subject to this Order being revisited if Mr. Dougherty and counsel fail to follow the local civil court rules. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/03/2020. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Order (MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER LCvR83.3(c)) by Smith Drug Co. (Dougherty, Colin) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Smith Drug Co. (Dougherty, Colin) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. The Court extends the deadlines for Distributor Defendants to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition [Doc. No. 1-3] until sixty (60) days after the later of (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/01/2020. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File, without prejudice to resubmission in compliance with the local rules. This filing does not comply with the local rules of this district, which require that each motion filed shall be a separate document. See LCvR7.1(c). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/01/2020. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings). The Court extends the deadlines for Moving Defendants to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. No. 1-3] until forty-five (45) days after the later of (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/01/2020. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND FOR RELIEF UNDER LCvR83.3(c) by Smith Drug Co. (Dougherty, Colin) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Cardinal), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (McKeson), #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion for Extension (McKesson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance (ABDC), #8 Exhibit 8 - Motion for Extension (ABDC), #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Motion (ABDC), #10 Exhibit 10 - Appearance & Motion (CVS), #11 Exhibit 11 - Order Granting Extension (CVS), #12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting Extension (McKesson), #13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Removal (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Removal (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 14 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,, (Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The Disclosure Statement #9 filed by Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. is STRICKEN as not compliant with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 as it does not identify any parent corporation or state that there is no such corporation. Defendant is ORDERED to refile a Rule 7.1-compliant disclosure statement in seven days or by September 4, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/28/2020. (em) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 25, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3243247. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2020-382 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 02 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 03 Petition, #4 Exhibit 04 Summons to Actavis LLC, #5 Exhibit 05 Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #6 Exhibit 06 Summons to Actavis PLC, #7 Exhibit 07 Summons to Allergan PLC, #8 Exhibit 08 Summons to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #9 Exhibit 09 Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons to Cephalon Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons to Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons to Indivior Inc, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons to Indivior PLC, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons to Johnson and Johnson, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons to McKesson Corporation, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons to Morris and Dickson Co LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons to Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons to Par Pharmaceutical Inc, #29 Exhibit 29 Summons to SAJ Distributors, #30 Exhibit 30 Summons to Sandoz Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 Summons to SpecGx LLC, #32 Exhibit 32 Summons to Smith Drug Company, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #34 Exhibit 34 Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #36 Exhibit 36 Summons to WalMart Inc, #37 Exhibit 37 Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #38 Exhibit 38 Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #39 Exhibit 39 Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #40 Exhibit 40 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #41 Exhibit 41 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #42 Exhibit 42 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (filed by McKesson and Cardinal), #43 Exhibit 43 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #44 Exhibit 44 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (filed by ABDC), #45 Exhibit 45 Order Granting Motion for Enlargement (ABDC), #46 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) [Transferred from okwd on 9/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of El Reno v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior PLC
Represented By: Michael R Perri
Represented By: Socorro A Dooley
Represented By: Jason A Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Represented By: Spencer B Housley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Perri
Represented By: Socorro A Dooley
Represented By: Jason A Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp doing business as Hikma
Represented By: Spencer B Housley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Reno City of
Represented By: S. Alex Yaffe
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?