Choctaw County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Choctaw County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sandoz Inc. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 1:2020op45257
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:20-cv-00156. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 HEARING ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Re: MDL NO. 2955. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Bernard M. Jones, II of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-156-BMJ. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-156-JFH. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Accordingly, defendants CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., shall file their answer, motion, or other responsive document and/or pleading to Plaintiff's Petition not later than forty-five (45) days from the later of: 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) the court rules on any motion to remand. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #17 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Accordingly, defendants McKesson, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint not later than sixty (60) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2020(White, Amy) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. Responses due by 6/17/2020(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 Supplemental Notice of Removal (Re: #3 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Accordingly, Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; and Sandoz Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition by forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action (sms, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/3/2020 to list movants and response deadlines (ndd, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 6/15/2020(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/28/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1368772 (Re: #3 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Choctaw County District Court, case number CJ-19-035 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/3/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
August 19, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Sandoz, Inc., SpecGx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Choctaw County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choctaw County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choctaw County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?