Hughes County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Hughes County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corp., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Harvard Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Corp., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., SAJ Distributors, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45258
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 49 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Eastern. Case number 6:20-cv-00160. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 47 HEARING ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Re: MDL NO. 2955. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #39 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Bernard M. Jones, II STRIKING #42 Defendant McKesson Corp.'s MOTION to Remand for the reason it was filed in error and DIRECTING Defendant to refile using the correct event. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 42 ***STRICKEN per Minute Order #43*** MOTION to Remand by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/24/2020(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 7/10/2020 reflect stricken (tls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #39 MOTION to Expedite Ruling) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Stay by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/24/2020(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Expedite Ruling of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Re: #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court) by Hughes County Board of County Commissioners Responses due by 7/13/2020(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Hughes County Board of County Commissioners Responses due by 7/13/2020(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Bernard M. Jones, II of the Western District of Oklahoma serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-160-BMJ. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-160-JFH.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, H. D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Docket Entry #34 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petition sixty (60) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action,or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 6/18/2020(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (McBride, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Corporate Parent H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC for H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.) by H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Huntsman, Susan) Modified on 6/5/2020: added corporate parent ABDC (nm, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., a/k/a Walgreen Co. (Docket Entry #29 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petition forty-five (45) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [NOTE: Attorney Amy D. White added to parties CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), CVS Pharmacy Inc. (pty:dft) and Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 6/17/2020(White, Amy) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc; Cephalon, Inc.: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, an Irish corporation; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., an Israeli company ("Moving Defendants'") Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Docket Entry #22 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition within forty-five (45) days after the later of: (1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Docket Entry #21 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Quest shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petition until sixty (60) days following: 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals (Docket Entry #10 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Anda Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint forty-five (45) days from the later of: 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 6/16/2020(Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 6/16/2020(Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-160-KEW.(lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. Responses due by 6/12/2020(Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kyle D. Evans on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : Counsel for defendant Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are directed to provide forthwith for use by the Court a bound manual copy of the pleading and/or exhibits as filed at Dkt. #2 . Said manual copies shall be EXACT duplicates of the pleading and/or exhibits AFTER said pleading(s) was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. Do not reorganize the document or insert other separately docketed items. If copies of sealed items are hereby ordered by the Court, then said copies shall be a separate and complete submission. (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/28/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1368906 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 6/4/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Hughes County District Court, case number CJ-19-036 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]
June 21, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GCP Pharma, LLC, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Hughes County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hughes County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?