Town of Poughkeepsie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Town of Poughkeepsie
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Walgreen Co, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Actavis, Inc. (f, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis PLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid Corp., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Kinray, LLC, Amerisoucebergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Cardinal Health Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cephalon Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Noramco Inc, Actavis LLC, Walmart Inc., JOHN N KAPOOR, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Sandoz Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45260
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-02431. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2804 IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2804 IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Marc Feldman terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/1/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE: Pursuant to the order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed today, notice is hereby given that a hearing session has been scheduled to consider various matters under 28 U.S.C. 1407. DATE OF HEARING SESSION: September 24, 2020. LOCATION OF HEARING SESSION: United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building; One Columbus Circle, NE; Washington, DC 20544-0005. TIME OF HEARING SESSION: 9:30 a.m. SCHEDULED MATTERS: Matters scheduled for consideration at this hearing session are listed on the enclosed Hearing Session Order and Schedule of Matters for Hearing Session. Section A of this Schedule lists the matters designated for oral argument by videoconference or teleconference and includes all actions encompassed by Motion(s) for transfer filed pursuant to Rules 6.1 and 6.2 and Orders to Show Cause filed pursuant to Rule 8.1(a). Any party waiving oral argument pursuant to Rule 11.1(d) need not participate in the Hearing Session videoconference or teleconference. Section B of this Schedule lists the matters that the Panel has determined to consider without oral argument, pursuant to Rule 11.1(c). Parties and counsel involved in these matters need not participate in the Hearing Session. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Letter MOTION to withdraw as Attorney requesting removal of B. Feldman from docket by Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc. (Feldman, Brian) Modified event from letter to motion on 8/18/2020 (Ortiz, Grisel). [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL Reply Declaration of Robert Kirshenberg, REPLY in Support filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - City Orlando Order, #2 Exhibit B - The Board of County Commissioners Order) (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer To National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit) (Badala, Salvatore) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala on behalf of Town of Poughkeepsie (aty to be noticed) (Badala, Salvatore) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 Memorandum in Opposition, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Replacing Incorrect PDF file filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt City of Buffalo Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt ToP Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - MDL Statement of Interest) (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt City of Buffalo Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt ToP Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - MDL Statement of Interest) (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall adhere to the briefing schedule set out in the Court's June 24, 2020 order concerning the motion to remand. The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement for Defendants' proposed motion seeking a stay. Defendants shall file their motion to stay concurrently with Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to stay within one week of the filing of Defendants' motion and Defendants shall file a reply, if any, one week after Plaintiff files its response to the motion to stay. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/8/2020. (Terranova, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Letter in Opposition of Sandoz Inc's pre-motion conference request by Town of Poughkeepsie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL Order Regarding Remand) (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Town of Poughkeepsie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Town of Poughkeepsie Complaint, #4 Exhibit Court Notice of Transfer, #5 Exhibit Sandoz Inc. Notice of Removal) (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Joint Letter requesting pre-motion conference by Sandoz, Inc. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court's pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendants shall file their opposition to the motion to remand two weeks after Plaintiff files the motion to remand. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed one week after Defendants file their opposition papers. The Court's "bundling" rule concerning the service and filing of motions does not apply to the motion to remand. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/24/2020. (Terranova, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Pre Motion Conference by Town of Poughkeepsie (Napoli, Paul) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 6/18/2020 (Ortiz, Grisel). [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court, Suffolk County, 400002/2020; containing certified copy of clerk's minutes and notice of removal. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Actavis LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Consent to Removal (Holly, Pamela) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until sixty (60) days following the later of: (1) the Court's ruling on a motion to remand (if any such motion), or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the multidistrict litigation for opioid-related actions (the Opiate MDL). Counsel are directed to submit a letter advising this Court within three (3) days of either of the above decisions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/5/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, and To Conduct 26(f) Conference for 60 Days by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Extending Time To Answer, Move Or Respond to Complaint and To Conduct 26(f) Conference for 60 Days) (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Sandoz, Inc. (Kirshenberg, Robert) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sandoz, Inc. from Supeme Court, Suffolk County, case number 400002/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12867635) Was the Disclosure Statement completed on the Civil Cover Sheet? - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Fee Waiver Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Entry & Order, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to County Clerk-CPLR Section 8019(c), #6 Exhibit F - Dutchess County Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit G - Court Notice re Transfer to Suffolk County, #8 Exhibit H - Suffolk County Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirshenberg, Robert) Modified on 6/3/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn). [Transferred from nyed on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Poughkeepsie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma
Represented By: Alexander Setzepfandt
Represented By: Christopher Yuk Lun Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. (f
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Carolyn Anne Silane
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisoucebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Michael T. Ferruggia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Mulry
Represented By: James Matthew Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: James Herschlein
Represented By: Julie Bauman Du Pont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Devon Wayne Galloway
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Pamela C. Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Ferruggia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN N KAPOOR
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Anne Silane
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Kirshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Rachel Esther Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?