Philpot v. Stenger
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Edward Stenger
Case Number: 1:2021cv00241
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (Attachments: #1 Order)(W,Na)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Case Dismissal, with prejudice. Related document #9 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (R,Sh)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Cole, Stacy)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Matthew M. Mendoza and Raymond Rundelli filed by on behalf of Edward Stenger. (Mendoza, Matthew) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (S,SR).
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/24/2021 at 03:00 PM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be sent by separate e-mail. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/26/2021. (R,Sh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Edward Stenger. (Barbara, Matthew)
January 31, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Edward Stenger. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
January 31, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
January 31, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,MT)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Darren W. Ford filed by on behalf of Larry G. Philpot. (Ford, Darren)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Cole, Stacy)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Edward Stenger. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10609060.. Filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subject Photos, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Certificates, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Images Nelson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Infringing Images Nugent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Infringing Images REO, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Cole, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Stenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Darren W. Ford
Represented By: Stacy A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Stenger
Represented By: Matthew M. Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew B. Barbara
Represented By: Raymond Rundelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?