U.S. Bank National Association v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00249
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 IMPORTANT Notice [non-document]: Ex-parte Telephone Conference with counsel for PLAINTIFF set for 6/7/2021 at 11:00 AM to be held before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Ex-parte Telephone Conference with counsel for DEFENDANT set for 6/7/2021 at 11:30 AM to be held before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Call-in instructions will be emailed to the parties separately. Related document(s) #17 . (D,JJ)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Mediation Conference: Mediation conference to be held on 6/8/2021 at 10:00 AM to be held before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. The mediation conference will be held by video conference. Instructions for participating via video conference will be emailed to the parties separately. Upon receipt of this order, counsel shall contact the magistrate judge's courtroom deputy via email to schedule an ex-parte telephone conference. See Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 4/16/2021. (D,JJ)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for mediation/settlement signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/13/2021. (S,KM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/13/2021. The plaintiff(s) shall identify experts, if any, by May 17, 2021. The defendant(s) is to identify experts, if any, by May 31, 2021.(S,KM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/13/2021. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/9/2021, with Responses due 8/23/2021 and Replies due by 8/30/2021. Status Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 12:00 PM and Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 12:00 PM, both to be held in Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. Discovery due by 12/20/2021. Jury Trial assigned on a two week stand-by basis beginning on 1/24/2022 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 18A. (S,KM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 Minutes of Case Management Conference before Judge James S. Gwin held on 4/13/2021. (Court Reporter: None;Time: 50 minutes) (S,KM)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Huda, Syed)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/12/2021 setting a case management conference on 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin.IMPORTANT: The Court requires the attendance of 1) named parties, 2) lead counsel, and 3) a representative with full settlement authority. (Attachments: #1 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fagnilli, David)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney James P. Botti and adding attorney Syed Ahmadul Huda filed by on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Huda, Syed)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Syed Ahmadul Huda filed by on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Huda, Syed)
February 8, 2021 Notice to Attorney James P. Botti. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
February 8, 2021 Notice to Attorney Syed Ahmadul Huda. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (North, Scott)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fagnilli, David)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Williams, Abigail)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Scott E. North filed by on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (North, Scott)
January 31, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT)
January 31, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)
January 31, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,MT)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fagnilli, David)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 20 941953 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-10609705. Filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A; Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B; Instructions for Service, #4 Exhibit C; Service Confirmation, #5 Exhibit D; Cuyahoga County Court Docket) (Fagnilli, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Fagnilli
Represented By: Nathan P. Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Abigail Grace Williams
Represented By: Syed Ahmadul Huda
Represented By: James P. Botti
Represented By: Scott E. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?