Fyffe v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Amy Fyffe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00332
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Parker
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 2/17/2021; Office of Regional Counsel on 2/26/2021 by FedEx; the U.S. Attorney General on 3/1/2021 (appears to have no signature) by FedEx, filed on behalf of Amy Fyffe. Related document(s) #6 . (L,Br)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285). (D,JJ)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 2/11/2021. (D,JJ)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff Fyffe's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 2/11/2021. (D,JJ)
February 11, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/11/2021. (L,MI)
February 11, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 11, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Amy Fyffe. (Wilson, Rachel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Amy Fyffe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst. US Atty for ND of Ohio, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst US Atty for ND of OH) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fyffe v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Fyffe
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?