Karkar et al v. Husary
Plaintiff: Hani Karkar and Amal Karkar
Defendant: Mousa Husary
Case Number: 1:2021cv00350
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint Filed March 10, 2021 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 16, 2016 Promissory Note)Related document(s) #5 .(Boles, Edgar)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Boles, Edgar)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order scheduling zoom mediation for 7/20/21 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Confidential mediation statements are due by 7/2/21. Counsel are to meet and confer by 7/7/21 and send to chambers by 7/9/21 a joint report of negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 4/28/21. (D,Ky)
April 26, 2021 Minute Order [non-document]: Case called for Case Management Conference by telephone on April 26, 2021. Edgar Boles appeared for Plaintiffs. Randy Hart appeared for Defendant. The parties provided the Court with an update on their discussions with their clients about the potential for early resolution of this dispute. The parties will make initial disclosures no later than May 10, 2021. The parties are amenable to resolving this matter through mediation. Therefore, this matter is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for mediation. The parties will receive further instructions for scheduling the mediation from the Magistrate Judge. If necessary, this matter will be reset for a Case Management Conference in the event the case is not resolved at mediation. As the Court previously directed, Defendant made an offer. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/26/2021. (Y,A)
April 13, 2021 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Case called for Case Management Conference on April 13, 2021. Edgar Boles appeared for Plaintiffs. Randy Hart appeared for Defendant. The parties provided background on their respective claims and defenses. Counsel are directed to confer with their respective clients to determine if ADR or other resolution is suitable at this time. Defendant is directed to make an offer of settlement no later than April 20, 2021. The Court continued the Case Management Conference until April 26, 2021 at 11:00 am. The CMC will be conducted by telephone. The Court will provide dial-in instructions to the parties prior to the CMC. Time: 35 minutes. (Y,A)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to #5 Amended complaint filed by Mousa Husary. (Hart, Randy)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Mousa Husary. (Hart, Randy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Pursuant to Rule 26(F) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #6 .(Boles, Edgar)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mousa Husary on 3/22/2021, filed on behalf of Hani Karkar; Amal Karkar. Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/13/2021 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A)
March 12, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Mousa Husary placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 2970 0001 6613 3100. (L,Br)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 First Amended complaint against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Amal Karkar. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons) (Boles, Edgar)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 5, 2021 to answer filed by Defendant Mousa Husary. (Hart, Randy)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is unopposed and granted for good cause shown. Therefore, Defendant shall until and including April 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 3/10/2021. (Y,A)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mousa Husary (marked c-19) on 2/20/2021, filed on behalf of Hani Karkar; Amal Karkar. (R,AP)
February 16, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Mousa Husary placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70192970000166133087. (S,SR)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Mousa Husary. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint on Promissory Note against All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10643564. Filed by Hani Karkar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 12, 2016 Promissory Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Husary) (Boles, Edgar)
February 12, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 12, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karkar et al v. Husary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mousa Husary
Represented By: Randy J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Karkar
Represented By: Edgar H. Boles, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal Karkar
Represented By: Edgar H. Boles, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?