Swain v. Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Swain
Defendant: Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC and Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture
Case Number: 1:2021cv00522
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 Reply in support of #4 Motion to dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer of Defendant Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture, Erroneously Named as Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC filed by Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture. (Wedell, Kristin)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Frank E. Piscitelli, Jr. filed by Jo Ann Swain. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Aramark SOS, #3 Exhibit Internet Screen Capture, #4 Exhibit Affidavits)(Piscitelli, Frank)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer of Defendant Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture, Erroneously Named as Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC filed by Jo Ann Swain. Related document(s) #4 . (Piscitelli, Frank)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/21/2021 setting a case management conference on 5/25/2021 at 11:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. IMPORTANT: The Court requires the attendance of 1) all named parties, 2) lead counsel, and 3) a representative with full settlement authority. (Attachments: #1 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aramark, Other Affiliate Aramark Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corporation, Other Affiliate Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture, Other Affiliate Aramark/HMS, LLC, Other Affiliate Aramark Sports and Entertainment Group, LLC for Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC filed by Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture. (Wedell, Kristin) Modified on 4/16/2021 (L,Br).
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture. (Wedell, Kristin) Modified on 4/16/2021 (L,Br).
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amy Golembo)(Wedell, Kristin). Added Motion to change/transfer venue on 4/30/2021 (L,Br). Modified on 4/30/2021 (L,Br).
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC on 3/15/2021, filed on behalf of Jo Ann Swain (Piscitelli, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
March 5, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,MT)
March 5, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10701961. Filed by Jo Ann Swain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Piscitelli, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swain v. Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Swain
Represented By: Frank E. Piscitelli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyon/Aramark Denali National Park Concession Joint Venture
Represented By: Kristin L. Wedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?