Gannon v. Medina Township et al
Plaintiff: Brian Gannon
Defendant: Medina Township, Montville Township, Morley Brenenstuhl, Ryan Gibbons, Justin Harvey and John Doe Police Officers 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00601
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Management Conference Order: Case is assigned to the standard track. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 7/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2022. Status Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/13/2021. (P,K)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Case Management Conference held on 5/12/2021. Separate Case Management Conference Order to issue. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 15 minutes. (P,K)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Morley Brenenstuhl, Justin Harvey, Medina Township. (Imbrogno, Amily)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Ryan Gibbons, Montville Township. (Lute, Melvin)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Morley Brenenstuhl, Justin Harvey, Medina Township. (Imbrogno, Amily)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 5/12/2021 at 01:30 PM. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(P,K)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued by Courtroom Deputy. (P,K)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Morley Brenenstuhl, Justin Harvey, Medina Township. (Smith, David)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ryan Gibbons, Montville Township. (Lute, Melvin)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Melvin L. Lute, Jr filed by on behalf of Ryan Gibbons, Montville Township. (Lute, Melvin)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Gregory A. Beck filed by on behalf of Ryan Gibbons, Montville Township. (Beck, Gregory)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Morley Brenenstuhl, Ryan Gibbons, Justin Harvey, Medina Township, Montville Township. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - civil cover sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hall, Eric)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10720864.. Filed by Brian Gannon. (Hall, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannon v. Medina Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gannon
Represented By: Eric D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina Township
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montville Township
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morley Brenenstuhl
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Gibbons
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Harvey
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officers 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?