Alghusain v. Nemeth et al
Case Number: 1:2021cv00693
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), GexPro Rexel, Inc are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (W,CM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 174 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
March 29, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,CM)
March 29, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (W,CM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 173 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 5:20-cv-05175. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/29/2021. (Re: #67 , #84 , #85 , #87 , #116 , #119 , #121 , #122 , #134 , #155 , #169 ) (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
<
< [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING #170 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT JOHN DEARBORN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/26/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Plaintiff Ameer Alghusain and Defendant John Dearborn and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by John Dearborn. (Burke, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 20, 2021 Filing 169 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO DELAY RULINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY 90 DAYS filed by Ameer Alghusain. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/5/2021. Replies due by 4/12/2021. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 3/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING #167 STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT QUICKEN LOANS LLC WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Confidential settlement has been agreed on filed by Ameer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 3/1/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 27, 2021 Filing 166 NOTICE by Ameer Alghusain Notice of Pending Action of interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 2/27/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 165 Appeal Filing fee of :$ 505.00 paid. Receipt number 54611018602. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 164 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 5/6/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Motion Hearing VACATED, Motions taken under submission re #163 ORDER VACATING MARCH 18, 2021 AND APRIL 22, 2021 HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER VACATING MARCH 18, 2021 AND APRIL 22, 2021 HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/18/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
<
< [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 162 USCA Case Number 21-15110 for #161 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Ameer Alghusain. USCA Letter. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Ameer Alghusain. (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) I APPEAL AND DEMAND HEARING (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
January 20, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as Notice of Appeal to the N inth Circuit. Re: #160 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 160 *Filing Error see #161 for corrected NOTICE OF APPEAL* to the Federal Circuit by Ameer Alghusain. I APPEAL AND DEMAND HEARING Appeal Record due by 2/18/2021. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/20/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DENYING #151 MOTION TO ENTER THE STATE OF OHIO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/28/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 158 REPLY (re #155 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJason L. Nemeth. (Shaw, John) (Filed on 12/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 157 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #155 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition to Defendant Jason Nemeth Motion to dismiss filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 12/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 156 REPLY (re #134 MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Defendants Vinod And Nita Guptas Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byNita Gupta, Vinod K. Gupta. (Dwight, Kevin) (Filed on 12/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason L. Nemeth. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Z. Bivens ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Z. Bivens, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Z. Bivens, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Z. Bivens)(Shaw, John) (Filed on 11/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 154 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #134 MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Opposition and exhibits A-E filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 153 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #119 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING #150 STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DENNIS COCCO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/25/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
<
< [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 151 First MOTION for Hearing seeking permission to enter the State of Ohio for personal matters filed by Ameer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between Plaintiff Ameer Alghusain and Defendant Dennis Cocco and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Dennis Cocco. (Boscia, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G Boscia on Behalf of Defendant Dennis Cocco (Boscia, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 148 REPLY (re #122 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJoseph L Nemeth, III. (Shaw, John) (Filed on 11/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING #142 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING #141 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING #138 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING #137 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING #135 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (James Niehaus) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15222735.) filed by Nita Gupta, Vinod K. Gupta. (Dwight, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Klevis Bakiaj) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15222618.) filed by Nita Gupta, Vinod K. Gupta. (Dwight, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 140 REPLY (re #121 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) and Notice of Motion ) filed byRatanjit Sondhe. (Wright, Gabe) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 139 REPLY (re #119 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byBuckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC. (Flynn, Laura) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15221094.) filed by Dennis Cocco. (Zidar, Rachelle) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15221039.) filed by Dennis Cocco. (Alverson, Malorie) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 136 REPLY (re #120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byJohn Dearborn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Burke, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15219668.) filed by Edison Welding Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rodman, Rachael) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Nita Gupta, Vinod K. Gupta. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/3/2020. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Vinod and Nita Guptas Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Vinod Guptas in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Declaration Declaration of Nita Guptas in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Revised Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Dwight, Kevin) (Filed on 11/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 133 REPLY (re #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byEdison Welding Institute. (Brookey, Brian) (Filed on 11/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 15, 2020 Filing 132 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #122 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition to Defendant Jose[h Nemeth III Motion to dismiss filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 131 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #121 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) and Notice of Motion ) Opposition and Exhibit A-H filed filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 130 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) Opposition and Exhibits A, B and C filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 129 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #119 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition and Exhibits A, B and C filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Jason L. Nemeth served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached by USPS (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Dennis Cocco served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Attached proof of delivery by USPS (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 8, 2020 Filing 126 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) Opposition and exhibits A-F filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ohio Department of Higher Education served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Attached proof of delivery (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 11/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IGW Solutions LLC (Shaw, John) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 123 Certificate of Interested Entities by IGW Solutions LLC (Shaw, John) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph L Nemeth, III. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/16/2020. Replies due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Z. Bivens ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Z. Bivens, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Z. Bivens, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Z. Bivens, #5 Proposed Order)(Shaw, John) (Filed on 11/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) and Notice of Motion filed by Ratanjit Sondhe. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gabe P. Wright, #2 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gabe) (Filed on 10/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by John Dearborn. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Burke, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Flynn, Laura) (Filed on 10/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARINGS and CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Motion Hearings as to #84 MOTION to Dismiss , #85 MOTION to Dismiss , #87 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint,, #67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same reset to 3/18/2021 09:00 AM and Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 117 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edison Welding Institute (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Brookey, Brian) (Filed on 10/26/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Edison Welding Institute. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/9/2020. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachael L. Rodman ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Rachael L. Rodman's Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Rachael L. Rodman's Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Brookey, Brian) (Filed on 10/26/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING #112 MOTION FOR JOINDER AND ISSUANCE OF PROPOSED SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/21/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 114 REPLY (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byGexPro Rexel USA, Inc. (Shaw, John) (Filed on 10/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 113 REPLY (re #84 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byIGW Solutions LLC. (Shaw, John) (Filed on 10/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 112 Proposed MOTION for Joinder To join GS Operating LLC dba GexPro and issue proposed summons filed by Ameer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #107 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/19/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 110 REPLY (re #87 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint, ) filed byOhio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission. (Ezeolu, Ndubisi) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as a Motion. Re: #108 Proposed Summons filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STA FF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Lorain County Community College served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 108 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Local Counsel) filed by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc, IGW Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, John) (Filed on 10/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 106 REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same ) filed byQuicken Loans, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 10/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as Motion. : #93 Proposed S ummons filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 105 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #84 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition and Exhibit A filed filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 104 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition and Exhibits A and B filed filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 11, 2020 Filing 103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint, ) Opposition and Exhibit A filed filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Vinod K. Gupta served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Thomas J Stickrath served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Proof of delivery in personal capacity (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ratanjit Sondhe served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Nita Gupta served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Mike DeWine served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. proof of delivery in personal capacity at Governor Mansion (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Lorain County Homebuyers LLC served on 10/10/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Joseph L Nemeth, III served on 10/10/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. John Dearborn served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 10, 2020 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Proof of delivery is attached (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 93 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Summons)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING #89 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO QUICKEN LOAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #88 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 90 REPLY (re #67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Reply of State Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byMike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 10/7/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same, #82 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Quicken Loans, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 10/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proof of service filed by Ameer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 10/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint, filed by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/14/2020. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Ezeolu, Ndubisi) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Opposition to State Defendants's Motion to Dismiss first amended complaint filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/14/2020. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Z. Bivens ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Z. Bivens, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Z. Bivens, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Z. Bivens, #5 Proposed Order)(Shaw, John) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by IGW Solutions LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/14/2020. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Z. Bivens ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Dec of Z. Bivens, #3 Exhibit B to Dec of Z. Bivens, #4 Exhibit C to Dec of Z. Bivens, #5 Proposed Order)(Shaw, John) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw (Shaw, John) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 82 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same ) Opposition filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/29/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARINGS and CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. #67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same Motion Hearings set for 2/25/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT QUICKEN LOANS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman a for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 78 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff Ameer Alghusain to Respond to Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Quicken Loans, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 76 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Department of Higher Education.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 75 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lorain County Community College.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 74 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas J Stickrath.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 73 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Ethics Commission.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 72 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Attorney General.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 71 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mike DeWine.. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 70 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quicken Loans, LLC.. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE by IGW Solutions LLC (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #64 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Michael A. Walton Pro Hac Vice representing State of Ohio governor and Attorney General. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Ann Yackshaw Pro Hac Vice representing State of Ohio Governor and Attorney General. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14948284.) filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Walton)(Walton, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 63 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission.. (Mikula, Chelsea) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14947612.) filed by Mike DeWine, Lorain County Community College, Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Higher Education, Ohio Ethics Commission, Thomas J Stickrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Ann Yackshaw)(Yackshaw, Ann) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #58 Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion Requesting Leave to Substitute Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #55 Defendant GexPro Rexel USA, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #54 Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 13, 2020 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Defendant REXEL USA INC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 13, 2020 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Defendant IGW Solutions LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Respond filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint filed by GexPro Rexel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rose, Martin) (Filed on 9/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Nemeth in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Rose, Martin) (Filed on 9/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ohio Ethics Commission served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Zenobia Harris Bivens Pro Hac Vice representing IGW Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14921468.) filed by IGW Solutions LLC. (Bivens, Zenobia) (Filed on 9/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 9/16/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC's Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Same filed by Quicken Loans, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Bacon, Mary) (Filed on 9/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ameer Alghusain. Service waived by Edison Welding Institute waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. IGW Solutions LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Quicken Loans, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. GexPro Rexel USA, Inc served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameer Alghusain. Ohio Attorney General served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Proof of service is attached (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 9/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 31, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Refile as Summons Returned Executed.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #35 Certificate of Service filed by Ame er Alghusain, #37 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #41 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #36 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #42 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #34 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #39 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #43 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #40 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain, #38 Certificate of Service filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Edison Welding Institute by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Ohio Department of Higher Education by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Lorain County Community College by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Ohio Ethics Commission by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Thomas J. Stickrath by Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain successful service on Mike DeWine through Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful service on Quicken Loans LLC (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful Service on IGW Solutions LLC (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful service on Ohio Attorney General (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameer Alghusain Successful Service on REXEL USA Inc. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Edison Welding Institute, GexPro Rexel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDERING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. Re: Dkt. No. #3 . Mr. Alghusain must serve the complaint and summons on all defendants by 11/9/2020, or the Court may dismiss the action without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission (erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission. Service waived by Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission (erroneously sued as the Ohio Turnpike Commission waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Ezeolu, Ndubisi) (Filed on 8/12/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint naming EWI and gexpro as defendants, and additional exhibits against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B1-B13)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Exhibit and link to Amended Complaint . Re: #26 Amended Complaint filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT Exhibits B1-B13 against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised complaint and adding new Defendants against Ameer Alghusain. Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Edison Welding Institute and Gexpro Rexel Holdings are not named defendants in this case and th erefore no Summons can be issued. Re: #22 Proposed Summons filed by Ameer Alghusain, #23 Proposed Summons filed by Ameer Alghusain (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Ameer Alghusain re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Consent magistrate judge jurisdiction (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 8, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 8, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Summons. (Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/8/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Vinod K. Gupta. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Joseph L Nemeth, III. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Mike DeWine. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Jason L. Nemeth. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ohio Attorney General. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to John Dearborn. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ratanjit Sondhe. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ohio Ethics Commission. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Ohio Turnpike Commission. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Dennis Cocco. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Lorain County Homebuyers LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ohio Department of Higher Education. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lorain County Community College. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to IGW Solutions LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas J Stickrath. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nita Gupta. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Ameer Alghusain. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Replies due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Revised Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit U-Z)(Alghusain, Ameer) (Filed on 8/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for : 1. VIOLATIONS OF 2ND AND 14TH AMENDMENTS TO THE US CONSTITUTION; 2.DISCRIMINATION; 3.DISCRIMINATORY NEGLIGENCE 4.DISCRIMINATORY WRONGFUL EVICTION; 5. NEGLECT TO APPLY OHIO LAWS BY OHIO STATE AGENCIES against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #54611018476). Filed byAmeer Alghusain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 0A - L, #2 Exhibits M - T, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2020: #4 Filing Fee Payment Receipt) (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alghusain v. Nemeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?