Takas v. Medina County
Plaintiff: Nicole Takas
Defendant: Medina County
Case Number: 1:2021cv00792
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to take Deposition of Plaintiff Nicole Takas on August 9, 2021 filed by Medina County. (Reid, Timothy)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order scheduling zoom mediation for 9/16/21 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Confidential mediation statements are due by 8/27/21. Counsel are to meet and confer by 9/2/21 and send to chambers by 9/7/21 a joint report of negotiations. A zoom status conference will be held on 9/9/21 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr., on 6/7/21. (D,Ky)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute Order of Case Management Conference held on 6/2/2021. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 7/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., to conduct a mediation conference as soon as possible after September 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/3/2021. Time: 30 minutes (R,Sh)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures filed by Medina County. (Reid, Timothy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures filed by Nicole Takas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Persons with Knowledge, #2 Exhibit Documents in Support of Claims)(Miguel-Courtad, Melanie)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miguel-Courtad, Melanie)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/2/2021 at 03:30 PM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be sent by separate e-mail. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 4/23/2021. (R,Sh)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Medina County. (Reid, Timothy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Timothy T. Reid filed by on behalf of Medina County. (Reid, Timothy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore not issued. (M,MT)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10777908. Filed by Nicole Takas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miguel-Courtad, Melanie)
April 14, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,MT)
April 14, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takas v. Medina County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Takas
Represented By: Melanie V. Miguel-Courtad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina County
Represented By: Timothy T. Reid
Represented By: Kenneth E. Smith
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?