Palmieri v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Lambrini Palmieri
Defendant: Mike Lester, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Heather Castle
Case Number: 1:2021cv00797
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Minutes and Dismissal Order. Case Management Conference held on 5/14/21. Case settled and dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Time: 1 hr 45 min. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/14/21. (P,R)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulation & Order of dismissal of Defendants Heather Castle and Mike Lester. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/14/21. (P,R)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed Proposed Stipulation of Partial Dismissal Between Plaintiff Lambrini Palmieri and Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Mike Lester and Heather Castle, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Gams, Mark) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (S,AN).
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Lambrini Palmieri. (Masters, William)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Lambrini Palmieri. (Masters, William)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Rule 26 Disclosures filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Heather Castle and Mike Lester. (Gams, Mark)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/14/2021 at 01:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 5/12/2021. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/19/2021. (K,K)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit/Declaration of Filing Notice filed by All Defendants. (Gams, Mark)
April 15, 2021 Notice to Attorney John C. Calabrese. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (Gams, Mark)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 21 945005 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10778787. Filed by Mike Lester, Heather Castle, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint) (Gams, Mark).
April 14, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
April 14, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmieri v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lester
Represented By: Mark H. Gams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark H. Gams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Castle
Represented By: Mark H. Gams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lambrini Palmieri
Represented By: John C. Calabrese
Represented By: William N. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?