Hammett v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Hammett
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. doing business as Spectrum
Case Number: 1:2021cv00815
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss case or Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christine Flores)(Carr, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #8 Unopposed Motion for extension of 30 days until June 11, 2021 to answer Complaint. Charter Communications, Inc. answer due 6/11/2021. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/12/2021.(R,Sh)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of 30 days until June 11, 2021 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Carr, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Process Server executed upon Charter Communications, Inc. on 4/21/2021, filed on behalf of Kimberly S. Hammett (Badwan, Mohammed)
April 21, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. (M,MT)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Reassignment. This action is before the Court to correct a clerical mistake in the random assignment to a United States District Judge entered on 4/16/2021. The Court finds that there is a clerical error in the assignment arising from oversight of all concerned. Accordingly, the case is returned to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to a United States District Judge from the correct deck. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/20/2021. (JLG)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
April 19, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)
April 19, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,MT)
April 18, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet - filed by Kimberly S. Hammett. Related document(s) #1 . (Badwan, Mohammed)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan filed by on behalf of Kimberly S. Hammett. (Badwan, Mohammed)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Charter Communications, Inc. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10784078. Filed by Kimberly S. Hammett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Badwan, Mohammed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammett v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Hammett
Represented By: Mohammed O. Badwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. doing business as Spectrum
Represented By: Joseph S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?