Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC v. Blair
Plaintiff: Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Steve Blair
Case Number: 1:2021cv00852
Filed: April 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/2/2021 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Steve Blair on 6/7/2021, filed on behalf of Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC (Callow, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Steve Blair. (L,Br) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2021: #1 Additional Summons Issued) (L,Br).
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC. (Callow, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC. (Callow, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC. (Callow, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Request to Clerk for service upon Steve Blair by certified mail. filed by Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Summons in a Civil Action)(Callow, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
April 26, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (S,SR)
April 26, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
April 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Steve J Blair. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-10797657. Filed by Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Callow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC v. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Automotive Sales, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Callow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?