Baker v. City of Richmond Heights
Plaintiff: Robert Baker
Defendant: City of Richmond Heights
Case Number: 1:2021cv00856
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 Acknowledgement of receipt of certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet received on 05/17/2021 from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #8 . (R,AP)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #7 . (S,SR)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting Joint Motion to Remand pursuant to U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Court of Common Pleas of Cuyahoga County, Ohio. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/14/2021.(P,K)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Joint Motion to remand to State Court filed by Defendant City of Richmond Heights. (Mack, Lisa)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Richmond Heights. (Mack, Lisa)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order This matter was removed to this Court on 4/26/21. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 5/10/21, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/27/2021. (P,K)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by City of Richmond Heights. Related document(s) #1 . (Mack, Lisa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-21-945533 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10798696. Filed by City of Richmond Heights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D to Notice of Removal) (Mack, Lisa)
April 26, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (S,SR)
April 26, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Related document(s) #1 . (S,SR)
April 26, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. City of Richmond Heights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond Heights
Represented By: R. Todd Hunt
Represented By: Lisa A. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Baker
Represented By: Taurean J. Shattuck
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?