Smoky War Dog LLC v. Hachette Book Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Smoky War Dog LLC
Defendant: Omega Ventures, Perseus Books, LLC, Hachette Book Group, Inc. and Damien Lewis
Case Number: 1:2021cv00903
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Status Report filed June 17, 2021. Therein, Plaintiff indicates that it served Defendants Hachette Book Group and Perseus Books on May 11, 2021, and consented to an extension of time for those Defendants to file an Answer. The docket reflects that, on June 15, 2021, the parties filed a Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time until August 3, 2021 for these Defendants to file an Answer, which was granted by this Court. In light of the above, the Court is satisfied with Plaintiff's Response. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/21/2021. (P,K)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #13 . (Friedman, Joshua)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hachette Livre USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Lagardere Group for Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC. (Sarkar, Richik)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until August 3, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc., Perseus Books, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarkar, Richik)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #14 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time until August 3, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/15/2021.(P,K)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order to Show Cause: For reasons set forth in this order, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit an appropriate application for entry of default and an affidavit in support thereof, or show cause why said Defendants should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/14/2021. (P,K)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Perseus Books, LLC on 5/5/2021, filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Hachette Book Group, Inc. on 5/5/2021, filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Omega Ventures waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Damien Lewis waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Smoky War Dog LLC (Friedman, Joshua)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion of Sabrina J. Danielson, filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #5 . (Friedman, Joshua)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion of William C. Rava, filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #6 . (Friedman, Joshua)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ) Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/7/2021.(P,K)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ) Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/7/2021.(P,K)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for attorney William C. Rava to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10816202, filed by Plaintiff Smoky War Dog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of PHV motion (Document does not contain an original signature.))(Friedman, Joshua) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (M,TL).
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Sabrina J. Danielson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10816185, filed by Plaintiff Smoky War Dog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of PHV motion (Document does not contain an original signature.))(Friedman, Joshua) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (M,TL).
May 4, 2021 Notice to Attorney Sabrina J. Danielson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
May 4, 2021 Notice to Attorney William C. Rava. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Cipolla, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Cipolla, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10809958.. Filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Hachette, #4 Summons Perseus, #5 Summons Omega, #6 Summons Lewis) (Cipolla, John)
April 30, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT)
April 30, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)
April 30, 2021 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate filing fee. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10809958 and AOHNDC-10809920, filed by Smoky War Dog LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Cipolla, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smoky War Dog LLC v. Hachette Book Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perseus Books, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Emanuel
Represented By: Richik Sarkar
Represented By: James A. Dimitrijevs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Emanuel
Represented By: Richik Sarkar
Represented By: James A. Dimitrijevs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smoky War Dog LLC
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Joshua A. Friedman
Represented By: William C. Rava
Represented By: John S. Cipolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?