Lopez v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez
Defendant: Resurgent capital services and Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00916
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non document]. The Court grants the Defendant's unopposed Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. ECF #4 . Defendant shall file its Answer or Otherwise Plead no later than June 9, 2021. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 05/28/2021.(S,HR)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Motion for extension of time until 6/9/2021 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. Related document(s) #1 . (Elliott, Zachary)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Process Server executed upon Resurgent Capital Services L.P. on 5/5/2021, filed on behalf of Jose Lopez (Flick, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
May 4, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (S,SR)
May 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Resurgent Capital Services L.P. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10813349. Filed by Jose Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resurgent Notice, #2 Exhibit 2- Judgment Entry, #3 Civil Cover, #4 Summons) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Alisa Rose Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent capital services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Represented By: Zachary P. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?